Pollack v. Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Virginia Pollack
Defendant: Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated and Xanterra South Rim LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv08085
Filed: April 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony)
May 28, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Responses to Mandatory Initial Discovery (MIDP) filed by Defendant Xanterra South Rim LLC. (Bradford, Aaron)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss. Defendant Xanterra Parks & Resorts, Inc., only, shall be dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/28/2020. (MMO)
April 27, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Party Xanterra Parks & Resorts, Inc. by Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated. (Bradford, Aaron)
April 27, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Xanterra South Rim LLC.(Bradford, Aaron)
April 20, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Anthony James Crawford and Dana B Taschner on behalf of Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
April 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #27 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Xanterra South Rim LLC, Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type, not all caps. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
April 13, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron P Bradford on behalf of Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated, Xanterra South Rim LLC. (Bradford, Aaron)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2020 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 606, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Douglas L Rayes. The parties are directed to meet and confer at least 14 days before the Scheduling Conference as required by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/13/2020. (MMO)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 4/13/2020. (MMO)
April 10, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MAP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 23 Letter Re Transfer of 2:20-cv-00408 from the Central District of California to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-20-8085-PCT-DLR. (MAP)
April 10, 2020 Filing 22 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:20-cv-00408 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER ON STIPULATED MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue #20 is GRANTED. This case shall be transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. The parties shall hold a mediation within 60 days of transfer. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona, Prescott Division filed by plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in support of Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Stipulated Motion to Transfer Venue) (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. upon Xanterra South Rim LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Mishele Kieffer. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. upon Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 2/25/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Mishele Kieffer. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Association of Counsel associating attorney Dana Taschner on behalf of Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. Filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 21-Day Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #10 as to Defendants Xanterra Parks & Resorts, Inc. and Xanterra South Rim, LLC. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 15 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: First Amended Complaint #10 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write "see attached."Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Below the words, "SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION," please indicate, "ON THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT." The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (gk) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack, identifying Xanterra Parks & Resorts, Inc. and Xanterra South Rim, LLC. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #10 filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 10 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack(Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack, upon Defendant Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. served on 2/5/2020, answer due 2/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Albert Damonte, authorized agent for service in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Xanterra Parks and Resorts, Inc. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack, (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25125613 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Virginia Pollack. (Attorney Anthony James Crawford added to party Virginia Pollack(pty:pla))(Crawford, Anthony) [Transferred from cacd on 4/10/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pollack v. Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Pollack
Represented By: Anthony James Crawford
Represented By: Dana B Taschner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanterra Parks and Resorts Incorporated
Represented By: Aaron P Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xanterra South Rim LLC
Represented By: Aaron P Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?