Kile et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Adrian Nevarez Ponce, Beatriz Duron and Emily B Kile
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv08101
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
June 26, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
June 26, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
June 3, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Emily B Kile: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint upon United States of America on 05/26/2020. (Kory, Gabriel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services, and U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS)
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
May 21, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (BAS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Submitted by Emily B Kile. (Kory, Gabriel)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 REDACTION Complaint - Redacted by Emily B Kile. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Redacted, #2 Summons Summons - Redacted, #3 Affidavit Cert re Exp Test - Redacted)(Kory, Gabriel)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is directed to file the Complaint and documents (Docs. 1, 2, 4, 7) under seal. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file the redacted Complaint and documents on or before 4:00 p.m. on April 29, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G. Murray Snow on 4/28/20. (NKS)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER/NOTICE directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on July 28, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 4/28/2020. (REK)
April 28, 2020 Filing 7 *Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 6 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Correct Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Emily B Kile. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Corrected Civil Cover Sheet)(Kory, Gabriel) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #9 on 4/28/2020 (MAP).
April 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Beatriz Duron, Emily B Kile, Adrian Nevarez Ponce. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet to include the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 *Summons Issued as to United States Department of Health and Human Services. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #9 on 4/28/2020 (MAP).
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18224575. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08101-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 *SUMMONS Submitted by Beatriz Duron, Emily B Kile, Adrian Nevarez Ponce. (Kory, Gabriel) (BAC) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #9 on 4/28/2020 (MAP).
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18224575 filed by Emily B Kile, Beatriz Duron, Adrian Nevarez Ponce. (Kory, Gabriel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Certificate re Expert Testimony)(BAC) *Modified to Seal Pursuant to Doc. #9 4/28/2020 (MAP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kile et al v. United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Nevarez Ponce
Represented By: Gabriel Vicente Kory
Represented By: Jeffrey B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beatriz Duron
Represented By: Gabriel Vicente Kory
Represented By: Jeffrey B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily B Kile
Represented By: Gabriel Vicente Kory
Represented By: Jeffrey B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?