Mirza et al v. Bullhead City Hospital Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Irfan M Mirza and Vista Health Mirza MD PC
Defendant: Sharon Rains, Brian Rains, Malik T Rahim, Jarold Morgan, Mina Alfarfara, Lindsay Lauxman, Ihtisham Choudhry, Lubna Javed, Arden Lauxman, Richard Cardone, Rosemary Mays, Brian Womack, Unknown Parties, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Shawn Bristle, Howard Morris, Jon Jones, Desiree Morgan, Laurie Jones, Javed A Malik, Unknown London, Danette Bristle, Paul Sutera, Unknown Sutera, Irene Zehri, Fareeha Choudhry, Unknown Hawkes, Jennifer Womack, Ricardo Alfarfara, Theodore London, Unknown Morris, Joanne Cardone, Brent Hawkes, Waheed Zehri, Mohamed Ahmed, Warren Mays, Western Arizona Medical Center Medical Executive Committee, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation an Arizona corporation doing business as Western Arizona Regional Medical Center, Mark Rickets, Becky Lauxman, Freeha Azher, Mina Alfafara, Victoria London, Ricardo Alfafara, Sharon Rains Rickets and Tina Morris
Case Number: 3:2020cv08148
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER: Pending before the Court is the Stipulation to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Defendants' Time to File Reply Briefs (Doc. #43 ). As Defendants have not yet filed any Motions to Dismiss, the Stipulation to Extend Time (Doc. #43 ) is denied without prejudice. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/5/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
August 5, 2020 Filing 43 STIPULATION to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Defendants' FRCP Rule 12(b) Motions to Dismiss and Defendants' Time to File Reply Briefs (Second Request) by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dushoff, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC . (Dushoff, Matthew)
August 3, 2020 Filing 41 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mohamed Ahmed, Mina Alfafara, Ricardo Alfafara, Danette Bristle, Shawn Bristle, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Richard Cardone, Joanne Cardone, Ihtisham Choudhry, Lubna Javed, Jon Jones, Laurie Jones, Arden Lauxman, Theodore London, Javed A Malik, Rosemary Mays, Warren Mays, Desiree Morgan, Jarold Morgan, Howard Morris, Malik T Rahim, Paul Sutera, Unknown Parties, Western Arizona Medical Center Medical Executive Committee, Brian Womack, Jennifer Womack, Waheed Zehri, Tina Morris, Freeha Azher, Victoria London, Becky Lauxman, Mark Rickets, Sharon Rains Rickets filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC.(Dushoff, Matthew)
July 27, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE of Party Dismissal by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC. Party Brent Hawkes (M.D. - husband) and Unknown Hawkes (named as: Jane Doe Hawkes - wife) terminated. (Dushoff, Matthew)
July 23, 2020 Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Waheed Zehri, M.D. on 07/01/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 38 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Bullhead City Hospital Corporation dba Western Arizona Regional Medical Center on 06/24/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 37 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Jennifer Womack on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 36 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Brian Womack, M.D. on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 35 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Paul Sutera, M.D. on 06/30/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 34 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Sharon Rains on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 33 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Malik T. Rahim, M.D. on 07/06/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 32 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Warren Mays, M.D. on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 31 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Rosemary Mays on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 30 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Javed A. Malik, M.D. on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 29 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Theodore London, M.D. on 06/30/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Lindsay Lauxman on 06/30/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Arden Lauxman on 06/30/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Laurie Jones on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Jon Jones on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Brent Hawkes, M.D. on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 23 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Ihtisham Choudhry, M.D. on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Fareeha Choudhry, M.D. on 07/06/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Richard Cardone, M.D. on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Joanne Cardone on 06/28/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Shawn Bristle on 06/30/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Danette Bristle on 06/30/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 23, 2020 Filing 17 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC: Proof of Service re: Summons & Complaint upon Mohamed Ahmed, M.D. on 07/06/2020. (Wolff, Jordan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 10/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/20/2020. (CLB)
July 20, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE re: Acceptance of Service by Mohamed Ahmed, Mina Alfafara, Ricardo Alfafara, Richard Cardone, Joanne Cardone, Fareeha Choudhry, Ihtisham Choudhry, Lubna Javed, Theodore London, Unknown London, Javed A Malik, Rosemary Mays, Warren Mays, Desiree Morgan, Jarold Morgan, Howard Morris, Unknown Morris, Malik T Rahim, Paul Sutera, Unknown Sutera, Western Arizona Medical Center Medical Executive Committee, Brian Womack, Jennifer Womack, Irene Zehri, Waheed Zehri . (Papetti, Randall)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' "Stipulation (A) to Allow Plaintiffs to File a First Amended Complaint and (B) to Extend Time to File and Respond to Defendants' FRCP Rule 12(b) Motions" (Doc. #13 ), the Court will partially grant and partially deny the Stipulation (Doc. #13 ). For good cause showing, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file a First Amended Complaint prior to August 18, 2020. The First Amended Complaint shall remove certain previously (and incorrectly named Defendants) and shall correct certain Defendants' names only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their Motions to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (and Notices of Certification of Conferral) on or before September 18, 2020. For lack of good cause showing, the remainder of the Stipulation is DENIED. Responses and replies to any motions to dismiss shall be filed in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the District of Arizona Local Rules. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/20/2020. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
July 20, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION (A) to Allow Plaintiffs to File a First Amended Complaint and (B) to Extend Time to File and Respond to Defendants' FRCP Rule 12(b) Motions to Dismiss by Danette Bristle, Shawn Bristle, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Brent Hawkes, Unknown Hawkes, Jon Jones, Laurie Jones, Arden Lauxman, Lindsay Lauxman, Brian Rains, Sharon Rains. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Kelly, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John Christian Kelly on behalf of Danette Bristle, Shawn Bristle, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Brent Hawkes, Unknown Hawkes, Jon Jones, Laurie Jones, Arden Lauxman, Lindsay Lauxman, Brian Rains, Sharon Rains. (Kelly, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Unknown Hawkes, Unknown Parties: Acceptance of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Sheena Hawkes; Mark Rickets on 7-20-2020. (Kelly, John)
July 8, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Matthew T Dushoff and Jordan D Wolff on behalf of Plaintiffs Irfan M Mirza, and Vista Health Mirza MD PC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Javed A Malik. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Irfan M Mirza. (Minkin, Ethan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Summons Submitted filed by Irfan M Mirza. Summons submitted for Javed A Malek not issued. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit summons with defendant name matching complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Mohamed Ahmed, Mina Alfafara, Ricardo Alfafara, Danette Bristle, Shawn Bristle, Bullhead City Hospital Corporation, Richard Cardone, Joanne Cardone, Fareeha Choudhry, Ihtisham Choudhry, Brent Hawkes, Lubna Javed, Jon Jones, Laurie Jones, Arden Lauxman, Lindsay Lauxman, Desiree Morgan, Jarold Morgan, Malik T Rahim, Brian Rains, Sharon Rains, Paul Sutera, Western Arizona Medical Center Medical Executive Committee, Brian Womack, Jennifer Womack, Irene Zehri, Waheed Zehri. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Submitted by Irfan M Mirza. (Minkin, Ethan)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/19/2020. (LFIG)
June 19, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Vista Health Mirza MD PC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18397079. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08148-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vista Health Mirza MD PC. (submitted by Ethan Minkin) (REK)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18397079 filed by Irfan M Mirza, Vista Health Mirza MD PC. (submitted by Ethan Minkin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mirza et al v. Bullhead City Hospital Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Rains
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Rains
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malik T Rahim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarold Morgan
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mina Alfarfara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Lauxman
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ihtisham Choudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lubna Javed
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arden Lauxman
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Cardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosemary Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullhead City Hospital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Bristle
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Morris
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jon Jones
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desiree Morgan
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurie Jones
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javed A Malik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danette Bristle
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sutera
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irene Zehri
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fareeha Choudhry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Hawkes
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Womack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Alfarfara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joanne Cardone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Hawkes
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Waheed Zehri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Mays
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Arizona Medical Center Medical Executive Committee
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bullhead City Hospital Corporation an Arizona corporation doing business as Western Arizona Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Katherine Louise Hyde
Represented By: Andrew S Gordon
Represented By: John Christian Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Rickets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becky Lauxman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freeha Azher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mina Alfafara
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria London
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Alfafara
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Rains Rickets
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Morris
Represented By: Jennifer Soo Jung Lee-Cota
Represented By: Jared Lynn Sutton
Represented By: Randall Papetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irfan M Mirza
Represented By: Ethan Bennett Minkin
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Jordan D Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vista Health Mirza MD PC
Represented By: Ethan Bennett Minkin
Represented By: Matthew T Dushoff
Represented By: Jordan D Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?