Wilson v. Tuba City Unified School District et al
Plaintiff: Loretta Wilson
Defendant: Unknown Party, Gloriana Woodie, Tuba City Unified School District and United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv08151
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Court Five filed by Tuba City Unified School District. (Pauole, David)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Defendant's Unopposed Motion (Doc. #23 ). Defendant United States shall have a one-time extension up to and including Monday, September 28, 2020, to Answer or Otherwise Plead to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/13/20. (EJA)
August 13, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #15 Amended Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth K. Sichi appearing for United States of America. . (Sichi, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE re: SUBSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES FOR DEFENDANT GLORIANA WOODIE by United States of America . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sichi, Elizabeth)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Court Five filed by Loretta Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Trebon, John)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Tuba City Unified School District. (Pauole, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Tuba City Unified School District . (Pauole, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE re: of Certification of Conferral by Tuba City Unified School District re: #16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Court Five . (Pauole, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : Court Five by Tuba City Unified School District. (Pauole, David)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint (Clean Version) against All Defendants filed by Loretta Wilson.(Trebon, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #13 Amended Complaint filed by Loretta Wilson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 3, 2020 Filing 13 *Second AMENDED COMPLAINT (redlined version) against All Defendants filed by Loretta Wilson.(Trebon, John) *Modified text on 8/4/2020 and attorney noticed (REK).
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED granting the Unopposed Motion (Doc. #8 ). Plaintiff shall file and serve the Second Amended Complaint on all parties pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within fourteen (14) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 8/3/20. (SLQ)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by William Gregory Kelly on behalf of Gloriana Woodie. (Kelly, William)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Loretta Wilson: Notice of Service re: amended complaint and all accompanying documents upon William Barr on 7/7/20, U.S. Attorney District of Arizona on 7/1/20, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Trebon, John) *Modified to correct event type on 7/22/2020 (EJA).
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 *SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: summons and complaint upon Gloriana Woodie on 7/16/20 by Plaintiff Loretta Wilson. (Trebon, John) *Modified to correct event type on 7/20/2020 (EJA).
July 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Loretta Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Trebon, John)
June 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to United States of America, Gloriana Woodie. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(EJA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Loretta Wilson First Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Trebon, John)
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Amended Complaint filed by Loretta Wilson. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 15.1(b) - The amending party must file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading. Document is also not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please use event Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b)) and attach a copy of the amended pleading that indicates in what respect it differs from the pleading which it amends, by bracketing or striking through the text that was deleted and underlining the text that was added. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (EJA)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Loretta Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Trebon, John)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. civ. P. 4(m) on September 8, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/23/2020. (REK)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18407270. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-8151-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Coconino County Superior Court, case number S0300CV202000267. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18407270 filed by Tuba City Unified School District. (Pauole, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet -pg 3, #4 Exhibit)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Tuba City Unified School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloriana Woodie
Represented By: Paul Edward Frye
Represented By: William Gregory Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuba City Unified School District
Represented By: David Kapena Pauole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Elizabeth Kay Sichi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta Wilson
Represented By: John Trebon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?