Christensen v. USA
Petitioner: Gary Steven Christensen
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv08152
Filed: June 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine (PS)
Referring Judge: David G Campbell
2 Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 17 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis and #2 Motion to Stay Garnishment by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen. (MSA)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Movant must file a Reply to the United States' Response within ten days of the filing date of this Order. Failure to file a reply in accordance with this Order may be deemed as consent to the denial of the request for an extension of time to respond to the pending garnishments. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/10/20. (GMP)
August 5, 2020 Filing 15 *NOTICE of Service by Mail of Government's Response to the Defendant's Motion to Extend Time to Respond to the Pending Garnishments (Doc. #14 ) by USA . (Price, Lori) *Modified text on 8/6/2020 (SLQ).
August 3, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #12 MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order re: #9 Service Order (2255) Response to Defendant's Request to Extend Time to Respond to Garnishments filed by USA. (Price, Lori)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - (1) The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Movant's Application for Entry of Default Against United States of America (Doc. #7 ) and Motion for Clarification (Doc. #12 ). (2) Movant's Application for Entry of Default Against United States of America (Doc. #7 ) is denied. (3) Movant's Motion for Clarification (Doc. #12 ) is granted to the extent this Order clarifies the July 16, 2020 Order as explained herein. (4) The United States must respond within 5 days of this Order to Movant's request for an extension of time to respond to the pending garnishments. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/30/2020. (LAD)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order re: #9 Service Order (2255) by Gary Steven Christensen. (3 pages) (KFZ)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Correct Address by Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (2 pages. Note: This is the same address currently on the docket, 5150 N Schultz Pass Road).
July 20, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Government's Response to #7 Application for Entry of Default by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (3 pages)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Service Order - The Clerk of Court must electronically serve a copy of the #1 Petition for Writ of Error Coram Nobis and this Order on the United States Attorney for the District of Arizona pursuant to Rule 4, Rules Governing Section 2255 Cases, and the Memorandum of Understanding between the United States District Clerk of Court for the District of Arizona and the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Arizona. Dr. Christensen's #2 Motion to Stay is denied. The matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Fine pursuant to Rules 72.1 and 72.2 of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure for further proceedings and a report and recommendation. See document for further details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 7/16/20. (Attachments: #1 petition)(GMP)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE re: #7 Application for Entry of Default by Respondent USA. (Minder, Mary)
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Petitioner Gary Steven Christensen against USA. (LAD) (5 pages)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 REPLY to #5 Response to #2 MOTION to Stay filed by Gary Steven Christensen. (LAD) (3 pages)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #2 MOTION to Stay filed by USA. (Price, Lori)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. (BAS)
June 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Stay All Restitution Payments and All Garnishment Proceedings by Gary Steven Christensen. (filed pro se 3 pages and 1 page order) (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BAS)
June 22, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Error Coram Nobis re: Criminal Case No CR14-8164-PCT-DGC filed by Gary Steven Christensen (submitted pro se 18 pages plus envelope). (Attachments: #1 envelope)(BAS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christensen v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: James Richard Knapp
Represented By: Lori Lynne Price
Represented By: Mary Bridget Minder
Represented By: Peter S Sexton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gary Steven Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?