Scott v. Ventura County Employees Retirement Association et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Scott
Defendant: Ventura County Employees Retirement Association and Mary Anne Rooney
Case Number: 3:2020cv08166
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Response to both motions) filed by Lisa Scott. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Affidavit of Lisa Scott)(Schultz, Todd)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiff to file her responses to Defendants' separate #6 #7 Motions to Dismiss is extended through and including 9/4/2020. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 8/28/2020. (MMO)
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 *STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (STIPULATION) by Lisa Scott. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schultz, Todd) *Modified to correct event type on 8/28/2020 (EJA).
August 27, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Alexander Douglas Westerfield on behalf of Defendant Ventura County Employees Retirement Association. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 18, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ashley K Dunning on behalf of Defendant Ventura County Employees Retirement Association. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Mary Anne Rooney. (Thomas, Colleen)
July 29, 2020 Filing 6 *MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Ventura County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Marconi, Andrea) *Modified to correct event type on 7/30/2020 (EJA).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/9/2020. (MMO)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Mary Anne Rooney, Ventura County Employees Retirement Association. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18449502. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L. Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08166-PCT-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SCA)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Lisa Scott. (Schultz, Todd) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(SCA)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-18449502 filed by Lisa Scott. (Schultz, Todd) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Ventura County Employees Retirement Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventura County Employees Retirement Association
Represented By: Ashley K Dunning
Represented By: Alexander Douglas Westerfield
Represented By: Brett Christopher Gilmore
Represented By: Andrea Lynn Marconi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Anne Rooney
Represented By: Colleen Cox Thomas
Represented By: Timothy James Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Scott
Represented By: Todd A Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?