United States of America v. Warfield et al
Appellee: Sandra J Tillman and Lawrence J Warfield
Appellant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv08204
Filed: August 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Dominic W Lanza
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE BRIEF by Lawrence J Warfield. (Dake, Terry)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED that the United States of America's motion (Doc. #8 ) is granted. All parties' briefing in this action shall comply with the form and length requirements of Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8015. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 9/21/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
September 21, 2020 Filing 11 OPENING BRIEF by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Pages 1 to 20, #3 Pages 21 to 38, #4 Pages 39 to 80, #5 Pages 81 to 107, #6 Pages 108 to 148, #7 Pages 157 to 187 [pp. 148 to 156 omitted], #8 Pages 188 to 204, #9 Pages 205 to 224, #10 Pages 225 to 260, #11 Pages 261 to 273, #12 Pages 274 to 366, #13 Pages 367 to 381)(Ramirez, Edith)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Errata re: #9 Brief - Bankruptcy Opening re: Corrected Image in Light of Non-Substantive Errors re: Table of Authorities by Appellant United States of America.. (Ramirez, Edith)
September 17, 2020 Filing 9 *AMENDED by Doc. #11 * OPENING BRIEF by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Table of Contents, #2 Pages 1 to 20, #3 Pages 21 to 38, #4 Pages 39 to 80, #5 Pages 81 to 107, #6 Pages 108 to 147, #7 Pages 157 to 187, #8 Pages 188 to 204, #9 Pages 205 to 224, #10 Pages 225 to 260, #11 Pages 261 to 273, #12 Pages 274 to 366, #13 Pages 367 to 381)(Ramirez, Edith) Modified on 9/21/2020 (MAW).
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Initial Brief in Bankruptcy Appeal to Conform Length to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8015 by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Ramirez, Edith)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the United States' unopposed motion (Doc. #6 ) is granted. The deadline for the United States to file its opening brief is extended to September 17, 2020. Ordered by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/27/20. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAW)
August 27, 2020 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Deadline to Submit Opening Brief by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ramirez, Edith)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure 8009-1, 8009-2, 8010-1, and FRPB 8009(a), the appellant shall serve and file an opening brief with the Clerk, United States District Court, within fourteen (14) days of the date this order is filed [see attached Order for details]. Signed by Judge Dominic W Lanza on 8/19/20. (MAW)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF READINESS. The Record on Appeal from the Bankruptcy Court is complete. The Bankruptcy Court shall retain the record. The filing of this Certificate constitutes the date of entry of the appeal on the docket in the District Court. (Bankruptcy Court - Phoenix, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 3 Amended Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal (Amended to correct Bankruptcy Appellate Panel Case Number). (REK)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 Notice of Receipt of Bankruptcy Appeal. (REK)
August 6, 2020 Filing 1 Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter from Bankruptcy Appellate Panel of the Ninth Circuit (BAP No. AZ-20-1193) by United States of America. (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Warfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sandra J Tillman
Represented By: Cody Douglas Vandewerker
Represented By: Thomas Henry Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lawrence J Warfield
Represented By: Terry A Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: United States of America
Represented By: Edith Carmen Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?