Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated v. Francis et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated
Defendant: Gary G Francis individually and as sole officer, director, and shareholder of Canyon King Pizzeria, Inc. (d/b/a Canyon King Pizzeria) and Canyon King Pizzeria Incorporated doing business as Canyon King Pizzeria
Case Number: 3:2020cv08221
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/22/2020. (CLB)
September 2, 2020 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ryan R Janis on behalf of Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (Janis, Ryan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Canyon King Pizzeria Incorporated, Gary G Francis. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Submitted by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Janis, Ryan)
August 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (Janis, Ryan)
August 26, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18605415. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08221-PCT-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18605415 filed by Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated. (submitted by Ryan Janis) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated v. Francis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary G Francis individually and as sole officer, director, and shareholder of Canyon King Pizzeria, Inc. (d/b/a Canyon King Pizzeria)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon King Pizzeria Incorporated doing business as Canyon King Pizzeria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Incorporated
Represented By: Ryan R Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?