Yazzie v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Virgil Yazzie
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2020cv08244
Filed: September 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE re: Service of Court's Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc. 9) by Virgil Yazzie re: #9 Order, Set/Reset Hearings . (Sandweg, William)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is set for 12/8/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. See attachment for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/2/2020. (CLB)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Virgil Yazzie: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Court's Order of 9/18/20 (Doc. 6) upon United States of America - served on The Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Department of Justice, Washington, D.C. on September 28, 2020, and United States Attorney's Office, District of Arizona, Phoenix, Arizona on September 25, 2020. (Sandweg, William)
September 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Service of Court's Order Dated 09/18/20 (Doc. 6) Upon Defendant by Virgil Yazzie re: #6 Order re Rule 12(b) Motions . (Sandweg, William)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/18/2020. (CLB)
September 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Virgil Yazzie. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
September 17, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18676666. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J. Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08244-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Virgil Yazzie. (submitted by William Sandweg) (REK)
September 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18676666 filed by Virgil Yazzie. (submitted by William Sandweg) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yazzie v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgil Yazzie
Represented By: John Peter Ager
Represented By: William Henry Sandweg, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?