Mueller v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Bruce E Mueller
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv08344
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED: USMS Process Receipt and Return re: Summons, Amended Complaint, and Order upon Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney, District of Arizona on 2/22/2021. (REK)
February 10, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Bruce E Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (5 pages) (WLP)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the motion for summary judgment (Doc. #7 ) is denied without prejudice as premature. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must return the service packets by 2/11/2021 as previously ordered by this Court. See the attached order for additional information. Signed by Senior Judge James A. Teilborg on 1/28/2021. (RMW)
January 25, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bruce E Mueller. (SLQ)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER (Service Packet): IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of costs or fees or the necessity of giving security therefor. Service by waiver or service of the summons and complaint shall be at government expense on Defendant by the U.S. Marshal or his authorized representative. The Court directs the following: The Clerk of Court must send Plaintiff a service packet including the Complaint (Doc. #1 ), this Order, and both summons and request for waiver forms for Defendant. Plaintiff must complete and return the service packet to the Clerk of Court within 30 days of the date of filing of this Order. The United States Marshal will not provide service of process if Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order. If Plaintiff does not either obtain a waiver of service of the summons or complete service of the Summons and Complaint on Defendant within 90 days of the filing of the Complaint, the action may be dismissed. A Defendant who agrees to waive service of the Summons and Complaint must return the signed waiver forms to the United States Marshal, not the Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/12/21. (SST)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY - Within sixty (60) days after the answer is filed, Plaintiff must file an opening brief. Defendant must file an answering brief within thirty (30) days after service of Plaintiff's opening brief. Plaintiff may file a reply brief within fifteen (15) days after service of Defendant's answering brief. (See document for complete details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 12/30/20. (SLQ)
December 30, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (SST)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08344-PCT-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (SST)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Bruce E Mueller. (SST) (2 pages)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Bruce E Mueller. (SST) (3 pages)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mueller v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?