Cooper v. Window Rock Unified School District
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cooper
Defendant: Window Rock Unified School District
Case Number: 3:2020cv08346
Filed: December 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Alternative Service as set forth in the Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/11/2021. (LFIG)
February 10, 2021 Filing 6 First MOTION for alternative service by Kenneth Cooper. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Jordan, David)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Window Rock Unified School District. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Submitted by Kenneth Cooper. (Jordan, David)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/30/2020. (LFIG)
December 29, 2020 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19013970. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-8346-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
December 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19013970 filed by Kenneth Cooper. (Jordan, David) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooper v. Window Rock Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Cooper
Represented By: David Robert Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Window Rock Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?