Friess v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Plaintiff: Julie D Friess
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing also known as NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing and NewRez LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv08101
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer and extending the time in which Defendant Shellpoint shall respond to the complaint up to and including 7/14/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 6/24/2021. (KFZ)
June 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint)(Balser, Justin)
June 22, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing identifying Corporate Parent Shellpoint Partners LLC for Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Balser, Justin)
June 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Donald Balser on behalf of Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (Balser, Justin)
May 25, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing. (BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 24, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Submitted by Julie D Friess. (Kessler, Eric)
May 11, 2021 Filing 8 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 New Case Opened, #1 Complaint, 7 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Julie D Friess. (Kessler, Eric)
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #5 Additional Attachments to Main Document filed by Julie D Friess. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. The District of Arizona requires its own Civil Cover Sheet JS-44 which can be found on the Court's website, under Forms. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/6/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 5/10/2021. (KFZ)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #2 New Case Opened, #1 Complaint, 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Julie D Friess. (Kessler, Eric)
May 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Julie D Friess. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file an Automated Civil Cover Sheet. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Julie D Friess. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19444509. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08101-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19444509 filed by Julie D Friess.(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Friess v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing also known as NewRez LLC doing business as Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NewRez LLC
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie D Friess
Represented By: Eric Walter Kessler
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?