Cornwell Quality Tools Company v. Thompson
Plaintiff: Cornwell Quality Tools Company
Defendant: Seldon A Thompson
Case Number: 3:2021cv08119
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Susan M Brnovich
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 12 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Cornwell Quality Tools Company: Affidavit of Service re: Summons served upon Brent for Seldon Thompson on 7/10/21. (Buck, Adam)
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Cornwell Quality Tools Company. (Buck, Adam)
June 7, 2021 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: SECOND Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (ESG)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 *ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 8/23/2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/26/2021. (ESG) *Docket text modified on 5/26/2021 to correct the deadline from 8/26/21 to 8/23/2021. (ESG)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/26/2021. (ESG)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 5/26/2021. (ESG)
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Seldon A Thompson. (REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(REM)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19502152. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08119-PCT-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Cornwell Quality Tools Company.(Buck, Adam) (REM)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cornwell Quality Tools Company.(Buck, Adam) (REM)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19502152 filed by Cornwell Quality Tools Company.(Buck, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cornwell Quality Tools Company v. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cornwell Quality Tools Company
Represented By: Jonathan B Frutkin
Represented By: Adam Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seldon A Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?