Deutsch v. American Century Investments et al
Plaintiff: Robert Deutsch
Defendant: Unknown Parties and American Century Investments
Case Number: 3:2021cv08136
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Court's order (Doc. #7 ) issued July 30, 2021 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve Defendant with the summons and complaint and file with the Clerk of the Court proof thereof pursuant to Rule 4(l), or otherwise show good cause for the failure to timely serve by no later than September 10, 2021. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Clerk of Court shall dismiss this action for Plaintiff's lack of service pursuant to Rule 4(m). See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 08/02/2021. (MHW)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 *VACATED pursuant to #8 Order -- ORDER that counsel for Plaintiff shall file a status report within 7 days of the date of this Order concerning the status of its case against this Defendant(s). FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to dismiss the case in its entirety without further order of the Court if Plaintiff does not file a status report or an application for entry of default within the timeframe specified herein. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 7/30/2021. (RMV) *Modified on 8/2/2021 (MHW).
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Robert Deutsch: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon American Century Investments on 06/25/2021. (Reissner, Joel)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 6/11/2021. (RMV)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to American Century Investments. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19560490. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Douglas L Rayes. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8136-PCT-DLR. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Robert Deutsch. (Reissner, Joel) (JAM)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19560490 filed by Robert Deutsch. (Reissner, Joel) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsch v. American Century Investments et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Deutsch
Represented By: Joel Newell Reissner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Century Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?