Pilot Institute LLC v. Checkride Prep LLC et al
Plaintiff: Pilot Institute LLC
Defendant: Checkride Prep LLC, Prep Group LLC, David Tushin and Global Aviation Institute LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv08166
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: G Murray Snow
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael)
January 3, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC, David Tushin. (Pearson, Robert)
December 27, 2021 Filing 34 NOTICE of Errata re: #33 Notice of Service of Discovery re Plaintff's First Supplemental Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Pilot Institute LLC.. (Dvoren, Michael)
December 23, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael)
December 1, 2021 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael)
November 3, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by David Tushin. (Pearson, Robert)
November 3, 2021 Filing 30 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #26 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REK)
November 1, 2021 Filing 29 NOTICE of Service of Discovery by Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC, David Tushin . (Pearson, Robert) *Modified to correct event on 11/2/2021 (WLP).
November 1, 2021 Filing 28 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for January 7, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel shall set up a call-in number and include the information in the joint report due a week before the scheduling conference. The Clerk of the Court shall send copies of this Order to all counsel of record and to any parties appearing in propria persona. See document for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 10/29/21. (WLP)
October 29, 2021 Filing 26 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by David Tushin.(Pearson, Robert)
October 18, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE re: Service of Order by Pilot Institute LLC . (Dvoren, Michael)
October 4, 2021 Filing 24 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pilot Institute LLC: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 09/01/2021 to David Tushin . (Dvoren, Michael)
September 8, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC. (Pearson, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff and Defendants Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC and Prep Group LLC's Stipulated Motion #17 . FURTHER ORDERED Defendants Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC and Prep Group LLC's Answer #19 is deemed timely filed. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 9/3/2021. (KFZ)
September 3, 2021 Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading #11 Amended Complaint, #19 Answer has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (WLP)
September 2, 2021 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC. (Burris, D)
September 2, 2021 Filing 19 Defendants' ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC.(Burris, D)
August 31, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #16 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Global Aviation Institute LLC, Checkride Prep LLC, Prep Group LLC, #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline filed by Global Aviation Institute LLC, Checkride Prep LLC, Prep Group LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by attorney Robert S. Pearson but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to attorney D. Rob Burris. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (WLP)
August 30, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Stipulated Motion to Extend Deadline by Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Burris, D)
August 30, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by D Rob Burris on behalf of Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, Prep Group LLC. (Burris, D)
August 16, 2021 Filing 15 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pilot Institute LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, Order re Rule 12 Motions, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice re No Copyright, Trademark or Patent at Issue upon Global Aviation Institute LLC on 08/09/2021. (Dvoren, Michael)
August 16, 2021 Filing 14 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pilot Institute LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, First Amended Complaint, Order re Rule 12 Motions, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice re No Copyright, Trademark or Patent at Issue upon Checkride Prep LLC on 08/12/2021. (Dvoren, Michael)
August 9, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Checkride Prep LLC, Global Aviation Institute LLC, David Tushin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(BAS). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 6, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Submitted by Pilot Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Global Aviation Institute LLC, #2 Summons to David Tushin)(Dvoren, Michael)
August 6, 2021 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against All Defendants filed by Pilot Institute LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-B)(Dvoren, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Pilot Institute LLC: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Order re Rule 12(b) Motions, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Civil Cover Sheet upon Prep Group LLC on 08/04/2021. (Dvoren, Michael)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael)
July 29, 2021 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(REM)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED if any Defendants file a motion to dismiss under Rule 12(b)(6) or 12(c) and if Plaintiff contends any further amendment of its Complaint (Doc. #1 ) can cure any alleged deficiency, Plaintiff must submit, no later than the time it files a response to a motion to dismiss, a proposed amended complaint containing all further allegations Plaintiff could make. FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event a motion to dismiss is granted in any part, no leave will be granted to amend the Complaint beyond what is offered in that proposed amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/28/2021. (KFZ)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 4(m). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on 10/26/2021. Signed by Chief Judge G Murray Snow on 7/28/2021. (KFZ)
July 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Checkride Prep LLC, Prep Group LLC, David Tushin. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 27, 2021 Filing 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19705245. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08166-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Pilot Institute LLC.(Dvoren, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(REM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael) (REM)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19705245 filed by Pilot Institute LLC. (Dvoren, Michael) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(REM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pilot Institute LLC v. Checkride Prep LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pilot Institute LLC
Represented By: Laura Allison Rogal
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Dvoren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Checkride Prep LLC
Represented By: D Rob Burris
Represented By: Robert Scott Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prep Group LLC
Represented By: D Rob Burris
Represented By: Robert Scott Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Tushin
Represented By: D Rob Burris
Represented By: Robert Scott Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Aviation Institute LLC
Represented By: D Rob Burris
Represented By: Robert Scott Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?