Voris v. Novatney et al
Plaintiff: John Voris
Defendant: Ramon Novatney, Unknown Novatney, Juanita Novatney, Edward Fogal, Unknown Fogal, Mary Ellen Fogal, United States of America, United States Department of Justice, Mohave County Treasurer and Unknown Parties
Case Number: 3:2021cv08184
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michael T Liburdi
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Good cause appearing, IT IS ORDERED granting the Parties' First Stipulated Motion to Extend Plaintiff's Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #4 ). The Plaintiff's deadline to respond to the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #3 ) is extended to 10/22/2021. There will be no further extensions absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Ordered by Judge Michael T. Liburdi on 9/22/2021. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RMW)
September 21, 2021 Filing 4 * Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hurley, Emory) *Modified to correct linkage and docket text on 9/22/2021 (MFR).
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certification, #2 Exhibit Judgment and Restitution Order, #3 Exhibit)(Hurley, Emory)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8184-PCT-MTL Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Mohave County Superior Court, case number S8015CV2021-00481 filed by United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Hurley, Emory) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Attachment, #4 Attachment, #5 Attachment, #6 Attachment, #7 Attachment, #8 Attachment, #9 Attachment, #10 Attachment, #11 Attachment)(JAM)
August 16, 2021 ***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED*** SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint (Quiet Title) upon United States of America by and through United States Attorney Office at 40 N. Central Ave., Suite 1800, in Phoenix, Arizona. on 7/15/21. (Original filed in Mohave County Superior Court on 7/26/21.)SERVICE EXECUTED : Declaration of Service re: Summons, Complaint (Quiet Title) upon United States Department of Justice by and through United States Attorney Office at 40 N. Central Ave., Suite 1800, in Phoenix, Arizona. on 7/15/21. (Original filed in Mohave County Superior Court on 7/26/21.) (JAM) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Voris v. Novatney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Voris
Represented By: Timothy Dean Rodriguez Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Novatney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Novatney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Novatney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Fogal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fogal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Fogal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Emory Thomas Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Represented By: Emory Thomas Hurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?