Still v. All Seasons Orchestra
Plaintiff: Judith Anne Still an individual doing business as William Grant Still Music
Defendant: All Seasons Orchestra
Case Number: 3:2021cv08233
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Property Rights: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re: #10 Notice of Settlement: IT IS ORDERED that this case will be dismissed with prejudice on 1/14/2022 unless a stipulation to dismiss is filed prior to the dismissal date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's Order (Doc. #9 ) is satisfied and no further action will be taken by the Court a this time. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 12/15/2021. (RMW)
December 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Judith Anne Still. (Speth, Maria)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff must show cause in writing why this action should not be dismissed in its entirety for failure to prosecute no later than 12/21/2021, unless a responsive pleading pursuant to Rule 12 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or an application for entry of default pursuant to Rule 55(a) is filed within such time. Signed by Judge Steven P. Logan on 12/14/2021. (RMW)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Judith Anne Still: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Preliminary Order, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright upon All Seasons Orchestra on 11/04/2021. (Speth, Maria)
November 19, 2021 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Donald Wayne Bicknell on behalf of Defendant All Seasons Orchestra. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by Judith Anne Still. (Speth, Maria)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED: 1. That Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than January 19, 2022; 2. That Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court; and 3. That unless the Court orders otherwise, on January 19, 2022, the Clerk of Court shall terminate without further notice any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 10/21/21. (SMH)
October 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Seasons Orchestra. (JAM). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (Attachments: #1 AO 121)(JAM)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19989966. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8233-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM)
October 21, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Judith Anne Still. (Speth, Maria) (JAM)
October 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-19989966 filed by Judith Anne Still. (Speth, Maria) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Still v. All Seasons Orchestra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Anne Still an individual doing business as William Grant Still Music
Represented By: Aaron K Haar
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Seasons Orchestra
Represented By: Donald Wayne Bicknell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?