Ellison v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Inndia Ree Ellison
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv08254
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Michelle H Burns
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2022 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, Attorney General, US Attorney for the District of Arizona. (WLP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 the application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, without prepayment of fees or costs, or the necessity of giving security therefore. Plaintiff shall be responsible for service by waiver of the summons and complaint. See document for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 1/10/2022. (WLP)
December 30, 2021 Filing 8 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff Inndia Ree Ellison shall show cause in writing on or before January 7, 2022, why it should not be sanctioned or be held in contempt of court pursuant to title 18 U.S.C. 401 for failing to comply Rule 3.7(b) of the Local Rules of Civil Procedure. If Defendant complies with Rule 3.7(b) on or before January 7, 2022, by either consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction or electing to have the case assigned to a District Judge, the undersigned will automatically vacate this Order to Show Cause. (See Order for full details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 12/30/21. (SST)
December 17, 2021 Filing 5 *STATUS REPORT by Inndia Ree Ellison. (Vidrine, Dustin) *Modified to reflect Local Rule violation; attorney noticed on 12/20/2021 (SST).
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-8254-PCT-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MYE)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Submitted by Inndia Ree Ellison. (Vidrine, Dustin) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(MYE)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Inndia Ree Ellison. (Vidrine, Dustin) (MYE)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Inndia Ree Ellison. (Vidrine, Dustin) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MYE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellison v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inndia Ree Ellison
Represented By: Dustin Paul Vidrine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?