Poyson v. Shinn
Petitioner: Robert Allen Poyson
Respondent: David Shinn
Case Number: 3:2021cv08259
Filed: December 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Douglas L Rayes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2022 Filing 7 REPLY re: #4 Order on Motion for Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Petitioner Robert Allen Poyson. (Day, Therese)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Case Second or Successive Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by David Shinn. (Jarvis, Ginger)
December 30, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ginger Jarvis on behalf of David Shinn. (Jarvis, Ginger)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The Arizona Attorney General shall file a notice of appearance with the Court within 10 days from receipt of this Order. Respondents file, no later than 1/11/2022, a response to Poyson's argument that his Petition is not a second or successive petition. Poyson may file a reply no later than 1/25/2022. Signed by Judge Douglas L Rayes on 12/8/21. (DXD)
December 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT (MAP)
December 7, 2021 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Robert Allen Poyson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(MAP)
December 7, 2021 Filing 1 SECOND-IN-TIME PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (STAY OF EXECUTION) filed by Robert Allen Poyson. (MAP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poyson v. Shinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Robert Allen Poyson
Represented By: Therese Michelle Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Shinn
Represented By: Ginger Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?