Shirley v. Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Plaintiff: Samuel Shirley
Defendant: Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Case Number: 3:2023cv08101
Filed: June 2, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Fine
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 25 U.S.C. ยง 640 Indian Tribal Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2023 Filing 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Samuel Shirley: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Merrick Garland, U.S. Atty General on 07/24/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proof of Service)(Eastman, Susan)
July 27, 2023 Filing 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Samuel Shirley: Proof of Service re: Summons and Complaint upon Gary Restaino US Atty Dist of AZ on 07/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Returned Cert Mail Card)(Eastman, Susan)
June 27, 2023 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: That counsel having complied with this Court's Order, the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for July 24, 2023 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2023 Filing 7 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that Samuel Shirley show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/24/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 2, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
June 2, 2023 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-21971031. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-23-08101-PCT-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (SCA)
June 2, 2023 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Samuel Shirley. (Eastman, Susan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(SCA)
June 2, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number AAZDC-21971031 filed by Samuel Shirley. (Eastman, Susan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(SCA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shirley v. Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Shirley
Represented By: Susan Ingrid Eastman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?