Ward v. Figure Lending LLC
Plaintiff: Lee Ward
Defendant: Figure Lending LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv08116
Filed: June 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Referring Judge: James F Metcalf
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2023 Filing 45 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Figure Lending LLC filed by Lee Ward.(Webb, E)
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Chad A. Hester of Wallin Hester, PLC is substituted in place of Weiner Brodsky Kider, P.C. and Wright Finlay & Zak, LLP as counsel of record for Defendant Figure Lending. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/17/23. (MJW)
August 17, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Cheryl Chang, Jessica McElroy on behalf of Defendant Figure Lending LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 8, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Figure Lending LLC. (Hester, Chad)
August 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #4 ) is granted, and Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Doc. #19 ) is granted, and Plaintiff may file an amended complaint no later than 8/23/23. Defendant's Motion to Disregard (Doc. #24 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 8/2/23. (SMF)
July 21, 2023 Remark: Out of state attorney G Franklin Lemond Jr terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 13, 2023 Filing 41 NOTICE re: Service of Order on Defendant by Lee Ward re: #40 Order, . (Webb, E)
July 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 PRELIMINARY ORDER - This matter having recently come before this Court, the parties are advised of the following preliminary policies and procedures that will govern these proceedings, and are ordered as follows...IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 7/12/2023. (WLP)
July 11, 2023 Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Steven P Logan. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-23-8116-PCT-SPL. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for August 7, 2023 is hereby vacated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 11, 2023 Filing 38 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 11, 2023 Filing 37 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
July 11, 2023 Filing 36 NOTICE re: Related Action by Lee Ward . (Webb, E)
July 11, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for E Adam Webb on behalf of Plaintiff Lee Ward. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Figure Lending LLC show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
July 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER that Lee Ward show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/7/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 602, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 30, 2023 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Greyson J. Wallis and Matthew R. Rosenkoff filed by Robert Riether. (Riether, Robert)
June 29, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Mitchel Howard Kider on behalf of Defendant Figure Lending LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 28, 2023 Filing 30 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #24 MOTION for Relief to Disregard Plaintiffs Notice of Subsequent Development (Dkt. 23) filed by Figure Lending LLC. (Riether, Robert)
June 28, 2023 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Riether on behalf of Figure Lending LLC. (Riether, Robert)
June 28, 2023 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Joseph M Katz on behalf of Defendant Figure Lending LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 23, 2023 Filing 28 NOTICE Re Transfer of 1:23-cv-00516-MLB (RDC) from the Northern District of Georgia to the District of Arizona. New Case Number: CV-23-8116-PCT-JFM. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consent Form)(MAP)
June 23, 2023 Filing 27 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00516 . Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 23, 2023 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. Deferring ruling on #24 Motion for Relief; #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; #19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 06/21/2023. (kng) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
June 15, 2023 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Relief to Disregard Plaintiffs Notice of Subsequent Development (Dkt. 23) filed by Lee Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Equifax Dispute Report))(Lemond, G.) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
June 1, 2023 Filing 24 MOTION for Relief to Disregard Plaintiffs Notice of Subsequent Development (Dkt. 23) with Brief In Support by Figure Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief)(Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
May 18, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE by Lee Ward of Subsequent Development (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Second Declaration of Lee Ward))(Lemond, G.) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
April 13, 2023 Submission of #19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jpk) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 31, 2023 Submission of #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona and #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jpk) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 29, 2023 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 15, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint with Brief In Support by Lee Ward. (Lemond, G.) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 15, 2023 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona filed by Lee Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Georgia Business Information Form), #2 Exhibit B (Arizona Application for Registration), #3 Exhibit C (Declaration of Lee Ward), #4 Exhibit D (Atlanta Airport Fact Sheet))(Lemond, G.) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 15, 2023 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Lee Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Lee Ward))(Lemond, G.) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING the #6 Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal. The unredacted version of Defendants Exhibit A, (Doc. 5-1), in support of Defendants Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. 4). 2. The unredacted version of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Angela Granados, (Doc. 5-1), in Support of Defendants Motion to Transfer, (Doc. 3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 3/2/23. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #10 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Greyson Joy Wallis. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 3/2/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2023: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jpa). [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 2, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing re #15 Order on Application for Admission PHV (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 1, 2023 Submission of #6 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #5 Notice of Filing to Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon. (jpk) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
March 1, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #10 APPLICATION for Admission of Greyson Joy Wallis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382131). Attorney Greyson Joy Wallis added appearing on behalf of Figure Lending, LLC (rvb) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Mitchel Howard Kider. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/23/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING the #11 Motion for Extension of Time through 3/15/2023 for Plaintiff to Respond to the #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona and #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Regina D Cannon on 2/22/23. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Joseph Michael Katz. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 2/22/23. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(jpa) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 22, 2023 Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Joseph Michael Katz re #12 Order on Application for Admission PHV. (jpa) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 22, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #7 APPLICATION for Admission of Mitchel Howard Kider Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382128).. Attorney Mitchel H. Kider added appearing on behalf of Figure Lending, LLC (kkh)[Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 21, 2023 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re: #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona by Lee Ward. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lemond, G.) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 21, 2023 Filing 10 APPLICATION for Admission of Greyson Joy Wallis Pro Hac Vice.by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 21, 2023 APPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #8 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Michael Katz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382130).. Attorney Joseph Michael Katz added appearing on behalf of Figure Lending, LLC (kkh) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 21, 2023 RETURN of #9 APPLICATION for Admission of Greyson Joy Wallis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382131). Return to attorney for correction. Please list all courts that you have been admitted to. You listed Washington, DC and USDC for the District of Columbia. (kkh) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Admission of Greyson Joy Wallis Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382131).by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Admission of Joseph Michael Katz Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382130).by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 7 APPLICATION for Admission of Mitchel Howard Kider Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number AGANDC-12382128).by Figure Lending, LLC. (Rosenkoff, Matthew) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse. [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: #5 Notice of Filing with Brief In Support by Figure Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit A to Motion to Transfer and Exhibit A to Motion to Dismiss by Figure Lending, LLC (SEALED Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - HELOC Agreement (unredacted))(Rosenkoff, Matthew) Modified on 3/2/2023 (jpa). [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Figure Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Exhibit A - HELOC Agreement (redacted))(Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 10, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Transfer Case to District of Arizona with Brief In Support by Figure Lending, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Angela Granados, #3 Exhibit A - HELOC Agreement (redacted))(Rosenkoff, Matthew) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Figure Lending, LLC. (pdt) [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]
February 3, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed by Figure Lending, LLC.. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-12365003) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit B - Copy of State Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(pdt) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 6/23/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. Figure Lending LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Ward
Represented By: Edward Adam Webb
Represented By: G Franklin Lemond, Jr.
Represented By: E Adam Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Figure Lending LLC
Represented By: Greyson Joy Wallis
Represented By: Joseph Michael Katz
Represented By: Mark Robert Rosenkoff
Represented By: Mitchel H Kider
Represented By: Matthew Robert Rosenkoff
Represented By: Cheryl Chang
Represented By: Jessica McElroy
Represented By: Robert Riether
Represented By: Chad A Hester
Represented By: Joseph M Katz
Represented By: Mitchel Howard Kider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?