George v. Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Plaintiff: Rosita George
Defendant: Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Case Number: 3:2024cv08102
Filed: May 22, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Steven P Logan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 25 U.S.C. ยง 640 Indian Tribal Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2024 Filing 8 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosita George: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Gary M. Restaino, U.S. Attorney for Arizona on 05/29/2024. (Paisner, S)
June 13, 2024 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosita George: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General on 06/03/2024. (Paisner, S)
June 13, 2024 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Rosita George: Proof of Service re: Summons/Complaint upon Chris Bavasi, Executive Director of Office of Navajo-Hopi Indian Relocation on 06/07/2024. (Paisner, S)
May 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff shall have sixty (60) days from the filing of the answer and record to file any desired motion, including a motion for summary judgment. Unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the matter will be deemed submitted when all motions, responses, and replies have been filed in the manner and timeframe set forth by LRCiv 7.2 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Absent any pending timely dispositive motion, this case will be dismissed as prescribed in LRCiv 41.1. Plaintiff shall serve Defendant with a copy of this Order within fifteen (15) days of any appearance. Signed by Judge Steven P Logan on 5/24/2024. (KLG)
May 22, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (DXD)
May 22, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23073532. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Steven P Logan. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-08102-PCT-SPL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (DXD)
May 22, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Rosita George. (Paisner, S) (DXD)
May 22, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23073532 filed by Rosita George. (Paisner, S) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(DXD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: George v. Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Navajo and Hopi Indian Relocation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosita George
Represented By: S Barry Paisner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?