Hualapai Indian Tribe v. Haaland et al
Plaintiff: Hualapai Indian Tribe
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management, Ray Suazo, Debra Haaland and Amanda Dodson
Intervenor: Arizona Lithium Limited
Amicus Curiae: State of Arizona and Nyla Hunsinger
Case Number: 3:2024cv08154
Filed: August 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Arizona
Presiding Judge: Diane J Humetewa
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. § 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2024 Filing 74 *AMENDED BRIEF Regarding Post-Hearing Summation by Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Berglan, Laura) *Modified text on 9/25/2024 (KJ).
September 24, 2024 Filing 73 *AMENDED by Doc. #74 * BRIEF Regarding Post-Hearing Summation by Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Berglan, Laura) *Modified text on 9/25/2024 (KJ).
September 24, 2024 Filing 72 RESPONSE BRIEF by Arizona Lithium Limited Intervenor Arizona Lithium Limited's Post-Hearing Summation Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Thorpe, William)
September 24, 2024 Filing 70 BRIEF Regarding Hearing Summation by Defendants Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Luecke, Daniel)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting the Joint Motion for Extension of Scheduling Conference and Joint Case Management Report (Doc. #68 ). The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for October 17, 2024, is vacated, to be reset upon resolution of the Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 24, 2024 Filing 68 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Conference and Joint Case Management Report by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berglan, Laura)
September 21, 2024 Filing 71 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING proceedings held on 09/17/2024 before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter: Hilda Elizabeth Lopez, RMR, FCRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 10/15/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/25/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/23/2024. (RAP)
September 20, 2024 Filing 67 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #51 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae filed by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Marinelli, Matthew)
September 19, 2024 Filing 59 *RESPONSE in Opposition re: #51 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae filed by Arizona Lithium Limited. (Thorpe, William) *Modified event on 9/20/2024 (KJ).
September 19, 2024 Filing 58 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management for proceedings held on September 17, 2024, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Marinelli, Matthew)
September 18, 2024 Filing 57 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #49 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus for the State of Arizona by Amicus State of Arizona. (Wrobel, Kristin)
September 18, 2024 Filing 56 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for Arizona Lithium Limited by Arizona Lithium Limited for proceedings held on 9/17/2024, Judge Diane J Humetewa, Judge Preliminary Injunction hearing judge(s). (Thorpe, William)
September 18, 2024 Filing 55 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST of Preliminary Injunction Hearing by Hualapai Indian Tribe for proceedings held on 9/17/2024, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Berglan, Laura)
September 17, 2024 Filing 66 MINUTE ORDER re: Exhibits. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 65 Witness List by Intervenor-Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 64 Exhibit List by Intervenor-Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 63 Witness List by Defendants. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 62 Exhibit List by Defendants. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 61 Witness List by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 60 Exhibit List by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Filing 54 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 9/17/2024. IT IS ORDERED that counsel may submit a summation brief of no more than seven (7) pages within seven (7) days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED taking the matter under advisement. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 9:32 AM to 4:58 PM.(LFIG)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that any party opposing the Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amicus Curiae State of Arizona (Doc. #51 ) shall do so on or before 9/20/2024. No reply will be allowed. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/17/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
September 16, 2024 Filing 52 LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae re: #51 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by State of Arizona. (Wrobel, Kristin)
September 16, 2024 Filing 51 MOTION to File Amicus Curiae by State of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wrobel, Kristin)
September 16, 2024 Filing 50 *WITHDRAWN by Doc. #57 * LODGED Proposed Amicus Curiae re: #49 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus for the State of Arizona. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by State of Arizona. (Wrobel, Kristin) Modified on 9/19/2024 (KJ).
September 16, 2024 Filing 49 *WITHDRAWN by Doc. 57* MOTION for Leave to File Amicus for the State of Arizona by Nyla Hunsinger, State of Arizona. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order proposed Order)(Wrobel, Kristin) Modified on 9/19/2024 (KJ).
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that upon receipt of the parties' pre-hearing filings, the Court finds cause to reset the start time for the 9/16/2024 Preliminary Injunction Hearing to 9:30 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Plaintiff and Defendant will be allowed two (2) hours for presentation and examination, and Intervenor Defendant will be allowed one (1) hour. The Court will not hear opening arguments, but the parties may reserve time for brief summations. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/16/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
September 13, 2024 Filing 47 NOTICE re: of Filing of Federal Defendants' Corrected Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Federal Defendants' Corrected Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Luecke, Daniel)
September 12, 2024 Filing 46 NOTICE re: Filing of Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Hualapai Indian Tribe . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Plaintiff's Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law)(Berglan, Laura)
September 12, 2024 Filing 45 NOTICE re: Notice of Filing of Intervenor Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Arizona Lithium Limited . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Intervenor Arizona Lithium Limited's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Thorpe, William)
September 12, 2024 Filing 44 Joint Pre-Hearing STATEMENT by Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Berglan, Laura)
September 12, 2024 Filing 43 NOTICE re: Filing of Federal Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management . (Attachments: #1 Attachment Federal Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Luecke, Daniel)
September 4, 2024 Filing 42 SUR-REPLY re: #35 Reply to Response to Motion, Intervenor Arizona Lithium Limiteds Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited. (Thorpe, William) *Modified docket text on 9/5/2024 (NKS).
September 4, 2024 Filing 41 *Refiled at Doc. #42 - REPLY re: #28 Objection, Intervenor Arizona Lithium Limiteds Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited. (Thorpe, William) *Modified on 9/5/2024 to indicate this is a duplicate refiled at Doc. #42 with the proper linkage (NKS).
September 4, 2024 Filing 40 *SUR-REPLY re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.1 - Fee to Trust Application Package (Part I), #2 Exhibit 1.2 - Fee to Trust Application Package (Part II), #3 Exhibit 2 - Exploration Plan, #4 Exhibit 3 - ADWR Well Abandonment Handbook)(Luecke, Daniel) *Modified reply type and link on 9/6/2024 (KJ).
September 4, 2024 Filing 39 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hualapai Indian Tribe: Proof of Service re: Complaint for Vacatur, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief upon U.S. Attorney General, Debra Haaland, U.S. Bureau of Land Management on 8/16/24, 8/15/24, and 8/19/24. (Berglan, Laura)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting the unopposed Motions by Federal Defendants and Intervenor Defendant to file sur-replies to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction [Doc. #36 ] and (Doc. #37 ). Any sur-reply shall be filed by 9/4/2024 and shall not exceed six (6) pages. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 29, 2024 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Sur Reply to Plaintiff's Motion for TRO re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Oral Argument Requested) Intervenor Defendant Arizona Lithium Limiteds Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By Preliminary Injunction by Arizona Lithium Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thorpe, William)
August 29, 2024 Filing 36 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Oral Argument Requested) by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luecke, Daniel)
August 26, 2024 Filing 35 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Frank Mapatis)(Berglan, Laura)
August 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Joint Stipulated Motion to Permit Reclamation Efforts. The #32 Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order is modified as set forth herein. See attached document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/23/2024. (RMV)
August 23, 2024 Filing 33 MOTION Parties Joint Stipulated Request to Permit Limited Reclamation Efforts re: #32 Temporary Restraining Order by Arizona Lithium Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order )(Thorpe, William)
August 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a Preliminary Injunction Hearing for 9/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Joint Pre-Hearing Statement due 9/12/2024. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/22/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 21, 2024 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER HEARING proceedings held on 08/19/2024 before Judge DIANE J. HUMETEWA. [Court Reporter: Hilda Elizabeth Lopez, RMR, FCRR, Telephone number (602) 322-7256]. The ordering party receives the transcript directly from the Court Reporter. Therefore, transcripts should not be viewed through Pacer. A non-ordering party may view a transcript at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber by filing a Transcript Order Form on the docket before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through Pacer. Redaction Request due 9/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2024. (RAP)
August 21, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Errata re: #28 Objection, by Intervenor Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited.. (Thorpe, William)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed Motion to Extend Page Limit for Reply in Support of its Motion by Seven Pages (Doc. #27 ). Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 20, 2024 Filing 28 *RESPONSE re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Oral Argument Requested) Intervenor Arizona Lithium Limiteds Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Intervenor Defendant Arizona Lithium Limited. (Thorpe, William) *Modified to correct event on 8/21/2024 (NKS).
August 20, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berglan, Laura)
August 20, 2024 Filing 26 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Arizona Lithium Limited for proceedings held on 08-19-2024, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Thorpe, William)
August 20, 2024 Filing 25 AMENDED TRANSCRIPT REQUEST pursuant to 24 Notice of Deficiency by Hualapai Indian Tribe for proceedings held on 8/19/2024, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Berglan, Laura)
August 20, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #23 Transcript Request filed by Hualapai Indian Tribe. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 5.5(g) - Documents signed by an attorney shall be filed using that attorney's ECF log-in and password and shall not be filed using a log-in and password belonging to another attorney. Document(s) signed by Caitlyn Brandt but submitted using the log-in and password belonging to Laura Berglan. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile Transcript Request with name/signature (sections 1 & 19 of the AO435 form) matching the name of the ECF registered user under whose credentials the document will be re-submitted under. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (RAP)
August 20, 2024 Filing 23 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Hualapai Indian Tribe for proceedings held on 8/19/2024, Judge Diane J Humetewa hearing judge(s). (Berglan, Laura)
August 20, 2024 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Hualapai Indian Tribe: Proof of Service re: Complaint for Vacatur, Declaratory, and Injunctive Relief upon U.S. Attorney Gary Restaino, Ray Suazo, Amanda Dodson on 8/9/24 and 8/12/24. (Berglan, Laura)
August 19, 2024 Filing 21 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Temporary Restraining Order Hearing held on 8/19/2024 re: Plaintiff's #11 Motion for TRO. Argument heard. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff's #11 Motion for TRO. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a Preliminary Injunction Hearing for 9/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Order to follow. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Laura Berglan and Roger Flynn for Plaintiff. Daniel Luecke and Matthew Marinelli for Defendants. William Thorpe and Mitchell Fleischmann for Intervenor Defendant. (Court Reporter Hilda Lopez.) Hearing held 3:33 PM to 5:19 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Intervene and #19 Motion for Leave to Appear at the 8/19/2024 TRO Hearing. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/19/2024. (LFIG)
August 19, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonic Arizona Lithium Limited's Motion for Leave to Appear at August 19, 2024 TRO Hearing by Arizona Lithium Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thorpe, William)
August 19, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Intervene Arizona Lithium Limited's Motion to Intervene by Arizona Lithium Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Thorpe, William)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER setting a telephonic Temporary Restraining Order Hearing for 8/19/2024 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/19/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
August 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting the Consent Motion (Doc. #14 ). The page limit for Federal Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Followed by Preliminary Injunction shall be extended from seventeen to nineteen pages. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 19, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re: #11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Oral Argument Requested) filed by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EA, #2 Exhibit 2 - EA App C, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 6 2020 Ltr., #4 Exhibit 4 - June 22 2020 Ltr., #5 Exhibit 5 - July 2 2020 Ltr., #6 Exhibit 6 - Site Visit Report, #7 Exhibit 7 - May 6, 2021 Emails, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 17 2021 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 - AZ Protocol Agreement, #10 Exhibit 10 - July 2021 Comments, #11 Exhibit 11 - MOU, #12 Exhibit 12 - March 2024 Comments, #13 Exhibit 13 - SWGL Report, #14 Exhibit 14 - April 2024 Emails, #15 Exhibit 15 - ROD and FONSI, #16 Exhibit 16 - Manera Report, #17 Exhibit 17 - August 5 2024 Email, #18 Exhibit 18 - July 2024 NTC Letter, #19 Exhibit 19 - Hualapai Draft Master Plan)(Luecke, Daniel)
August 19, 2024 Filing 14 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in the Amount of Two Pages by Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Luecke, Daniel)
August 19, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew Marinelli appearing for Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. . (Marinelli, Matthew)
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Followed by a Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Doc. #11 ). IT IS ORDERED the Defendants shall file a Response on or before August 19, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/16/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG)
August 16, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Followed By A Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support (Oral Argument Requested) by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Attachment Declaration of Loretta Jackson-Kelly, #3 Attachment Declaration of Chairman Duane Clarke, #4 Attachment Declaration of Marcelene Craynon, #5 Attachment Declaration of Richard Powskey, #6 Attachment Declaration of Ka-Voka Jackson, #7 Attachment Declaration of Thomas Delehanty, #8 Attachment Declaration of Laura Berglan)(Berglan, Laura)
August 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Luecke on behalf of Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Luecke, Daniel)
August 13, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Service by Hualapai Indian Tribe . (Berglan, Laura)
August 13, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Jeffrey C Parsons on behalf of Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference set for 10/17/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this order upon any Defendant(s) who have not yet appeared and shall file notice of service. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/12/24. (EJA)
August 7, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Roger Flynn on behalf of Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 6, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE re: Service by Hualapai Indian Tribe . (Berglan, Laura)
August 6, 2024 Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Heidi J McIntosh, Thomas R Delehanty on behalf of Plaintiff Hualapai Indian Tribe. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than October 30, 2024. Plaintiff(s) must promptly serve a copy of this Order on Defendant(s) and file notice of service with the Clerk of Court. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on October 31, 2024, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing any party appearing pro se to become familiar with the Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Such parties are advised of the free Self-Service Clinic at the courthouse. For information on the free clinic and the Handbook for Self-Represented Litigants, visit the Court's internet site at: www.azd.uscourts.gov. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/5/2024. (KLG)
August 5, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Hualapai Indian Tribe. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney must update PACER account to match law firm information on pleading: Roger Flynn. E-Mail address listed on pleading: roger@wmaplaw.org. E-Mail address in CM-ECF Account: wmap@igc.org. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
August 5, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amanda Dodson, Debra Haaland, Ray Suazo, United States Bureau of Land Management. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
August 2, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23316735. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-24-08154-PCT-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
August 2, 2024 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (submitted by Laura Berglan) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(REK)
August 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23316735 filed by Hualapai Indian Tribe. (submitted by Laura Berglan) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(REK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hualapai Indian Tribe v. Haaland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Matthew Marinelli
Represented By: Daniel Luecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Suazo
Represented By: Matthew Marinelli
Represented By: Daniel Luecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Haaland
Represented By: Matthew Marinelli
Represented By: Daniel Luecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Dodson
Represented By: Matthew Marinelli
Represented By: Daniel Luecke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hualapai Indian Tribe
Represented By: Thomas R Delehanty
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Laura Berglan
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Represented By: Thomas R Delehanty
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Jeffrey C Parsons
Represented By: Heidi J McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Arizona Lithium Limited
Represented By: William Lee Thorpe
Represented By: Mitchell Wade Fleischmann
Represented By: Bree Nevarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: State of Arizona
Represented By: Kristin Marie Wrobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Nyla Hunsinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?