Lambright, et al v. Lewis, et al

Petitioner: Joe Leonard Lambright
Respondent: Samuel A Lewis, Arizona Corrections, Department of, Robert Goldsmith, Dora B. Schriro and Charles L Ryan
Case Number: 4:1987cv00235
Filed: April 14, 1987
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: John M Roll
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2015 417 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 414 Motion to Modify 4/03/14 Protective Order. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 9/23/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
July 8, 2013 409 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 408 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; The supplemental reply shall be filed no latr than 7/29/2013.. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 7/9/2013.(JKM)
June 4, 2013 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Certiorari in this matter having been denied on June 3, 2013, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED lifting the stay of proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than June 24, 2013, Petitioner shall file a supplemental response to Respondents Motion to Modify Protective Order, which shall set forth the specific statements or information he contends are privileged and explain why each is privileged and protected from use at his resentencing. Respondents shall file a supplemental reply to this response no later than July 15, 2013. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/3/13. (KAD)
February 8, 2013 402 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 401 Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings and staying these proceedings until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 2/8/13. (KAH)
January 10, 2013 400 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, It is ORDERED that no later than February 11, 2013, Petitioner shall file a supplemental response to Respondents' Motion to Modify Protective Order. Respondents shall file a supplemental reply to this response no later than February 28, 2 013. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall re-open this case and shall substitute Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, as Respondent in place of his predecessors Samuel A. Lewis and Dora B. Schriro. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/9/13. (KAH)
May 4, 2010 385 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 376 Motion for Discovery; denying in part & granting in part 349 Motion for order to show cause; granting 345 Motion to modify protective order. Signed by Chief Judge John M Roll on 5/4/10. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF)
March 25, 2009 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 345 Motion to modify protective Order; denying 349 Motion for Order to Show Cause.. Signed by Chief Judge John M Roll on 03/24/09.(LMF, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lambright, et al v. Lewis, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Joe Leonard Lambright
Represented By: Dale A Baich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Samuel A Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Corrections, Department of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Goldsmith
Represented By: James Patrick Beene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B. Schriro
Represented By: Kent E Cattani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?