Medrano, et al v. Stewart, et al

Petitioner: Angel Mayora Medrano
Respondent: Terry Stewart, Earnest Trujillo and Dora B Schriro
Case Number: 4:1999cv00603
Filed: December 14, 1999
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2012 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 181 Response to Order to Show Cause and Motion for 21-Day Extension of Time to File the Request for COA filed by Angel Mayora Medrano. It is Ordered that any such motion shall be filed by November 21, 2012. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, Respondents shall not file a response. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/30/2012. (MFR)
October 11, 2012 180 Opinion or Order of the Court It is Ordered that no later than twenty (20) days after the filing date of this Order, Petitioner shall show cause in writing why the stay of his sentencing claims should not be lifted, the claims dismissed as moot, and judgment entered. It is furt her Ordered that any motion for issuance of a certificate of appealability shall be filed no later than twenty (20) days after the filing date of this Order (see attached PDF for more information). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/11/2012. (MFR)
March 2, 2012 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Claims 1, 2, 4, 14(A)(1), 14(A)(2), 14(A)(5), and14(B)(2) of Petitioners First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Doc. 30) are denied with pred judice.It is ordered that any party seeking reconsideration of this order pursuant to LRCiv 7.2(g) shall do so no later than fifteen (15) days after the filing of this order. The Petitioners sentencing-related claims remain stayed pending further ord er of the Court.The Clerk of Court substitute Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, for Dora Schriro as a party to this matter,pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 25(d)(1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court send a courtesy copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court, 1501 W. Washington, Phoenix, AZ 85007- 3329. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 03/01/12. (LMF)
August 29, 2011 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ; counsel for the Respondents, the Arizona AttorneyGenerals Office, expeditiously submit a Notice of Filing of the required documents listed within this Order. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/29/11. (SMBE)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medrano, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Mayora Medrano
Represented By: Timothy Michael Gabrielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Stewart
Represented By: Donna Jeanne Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Earnest Trujillo
Represented By: Donna Jeanne Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Represented By: Lacey Stover Gard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?