Jones, et al v. Stewart, et al

Petitioner: Barry Lee Jones
Respondent: Terry Stewart, George Herman and Dora B Schriro
Case Number: 4:2001cv00592
Filed: November 6, 2001
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2017 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Respondents' Motion to Preclude Strickland Experts (Doc. 229 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The Court precludes testimony from Petitioner's Strickland expert on issues other than the relevant prevailing professsional norms. Respondents 9; Motion to Preclude testimony regarding Sergeant Pesquiera's bloodstain interpretation expertise (Doc. 232 ) is GRANTED. Respondents' Motion to Limit Evidence to Original IAC Claim (Doc. 234 ) is DENIED. Respondents objection to Petitioner's Exhibit 139 is OVERRULED. Signed by Judge Timothy M Burgess on 10/30/2017. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
February 3, 2017 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that in accordance with the Court's Order, (Doc. 186 ) the parties, through undersigned counsel, jointly propose that the Court issue an order of protection to protect Petitioner's limited waiver of the attorney-client privilege, work product, and Fifth Amendment privilege, as set forth in the proposed order attached (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Timothy M Burgess on 2/3/2017. (MFR)
January 20, 2017 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that an evidentiary hearing to determine whether state PCR counsel was ineffective for failing to raise Claim 1D (Guilt Phase) and Claim 1D (Penalty Phase) in Petitioners first PCR proceeding shall take place as soon as is practicable. The Court will issue a separate order setting this matter for a scheduling conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall substitute Charles L. Ryan, Director of the Arizona Department of Corrections, as Respondent in place of former Director Terry Stewart, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ. P. 25(d)(1). Signed by Judge Timothy M Burgess on 1/18/2017. (BAR)
October 28, 2008 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 143 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 10/27/08.(JEMB, )
September 29, 2008 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly & Vacating 3 Order for stay of execution. FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING a Certificate of Appealability as to the issues specified in this Order. FURTHER ORDERED Clerk of Court forward a copy of this Order to Rachelle M. Resnick. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/29/08. **SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION**(JEMB, ) Modified on 9/29/2008 (JEMB,To correct docket text).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones, et al v. Stewart, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barry Lee Jones
Represented By: Sylvia Jeanne Lett(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Stewart
Represented By: Jim D Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Herman
Represented By: Jim D Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora B Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?