Rienhardt, et al v. Ryan, et al

Petitioner: Charles Bradley Rienhardt
Respondent: Charles Ryan, Charles Goldsmith and Dora Schriro
Case Number: 4:2003cv00290
Filed: May 30, 2003
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
Presiding Judge: David C Bury
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2016 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 238 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 3/23/2016.(MFR)
November 17, 2015 233 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 232 Motion for Order Allowing Confidential Contact Visit with Petitioner. Ordered that the Clerk of Court forward a copy of this order to counsel of record and to Michael Gottfried, Assistant Attorney General and Warden Ron Credio, ASPC. Signed by Senior Judge David C Bury on 11/17/2015. (See Order for Specific Details.)(BAR)
December 2, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 132 Motion Alter or Amend Judgment.. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 12/2/2009.(JKM, )
November 4, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 AMENDED Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly; Further ORDERED 6 Stay of Execution entered 6/6/03 is VACATED; Further ORDERED granting Certificate of Appealability as to specific issues; Further ORDERED Clerk forward copy of this Order to Arizona Supreme Court. ***SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 11/3/09. (CLJ, ) Modified on 11/5/2009 (JEMB, MODIFIED TO REFLECT WRITTEN OPINION).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rienhardt, et al v. Ryan, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Charles Bradley Rienhardt
Represented By: Amy Sara Armstrong(Designation CJA Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Ryan
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Goldsmith
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Represented By: Jonathan William Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?