Norby et al v. CITY OF TOMBSTONE ET AL

Plaintiff: Paige A. Norby and David L. Weik
Defendant: CITY OF TOMBSTONE ET AL, Stacey Korbeck-Reeder, Stephen Schmidt, Merlin Jay Smith et al, Dustin Escapule Jr. et al and STACEY KORBECK-REEDER
Case Number: 4:2007cv00232
Filed: May 21, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2012 344 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 312 Motion in Limine re: Exclusion etc; denying 313 Motion for Bond (Post Cost Bond) ; denying 314 Motion to withdraw jury demand and request bench trial; granting 318 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Supplemental to plaintiffs joint opposition to defendants motion requesting cost bond; granting 320 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Response to defendants request for court order for plaintiffs to post a cost bond ; gran ting 325 Motion to Strike Improper References to Confidential Settlement Discussions and Documents in Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Post Cost Bond ; denying 331 Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Sanctions ; granting 334 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental to Plaintiff's Joint Motion for Show Cause and Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' request for the Court to order Defendant to reimburse Plaintiffs for copying costs is DENIED. Defendant's request that he be awarded fees incurred in responding to the Motion for Order to Show Cause is DENIED (see PDF for more information). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/27/2012.(MFR)
March 31, 2011 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 190 196 [228 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs is awardedon the First Amendment, Fifth Amendment, Fourteenth Amendment, and conspiracy claims. The Fourth Amendment c laims being the only remaining claims, Korbeck-Reeder and Schmidt are DISMISSED from this action. Denying 252 253 258 Motion to Strike and motions to reconsider sur-reply. The parties shall submit their Proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before 05/02/11. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 03/31/11.(LMF)
December 1, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Clerk is directed to file 11/15/06 Notice of Claim as a supplement to doc 45 . Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 11/25/08.**SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION**(JEMB, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norby et al v. CITY OF TOMBSTONE ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paige A. Norby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Weik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF TOMBSTONE ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Korbeck-Reeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merlin Jay Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Escapule Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STACEY KORBECK-REEDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?