Wells v. Kearney et al

Plaintiff: Cheryl Wells
Defendant: Jan E Kearney, Clark Munger, Kyle Bryson and Julie Connors
Case Number: 4:2007cv00309
Filed: June 26, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline J Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 13, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 121 Report and Recommendations & 122 Report and Recommendations; dftS Cia Wells and Alan Belauskas are dismissed without prejudice from this case. The Court imposes $15,000 in sanctions against Pla; each parties requesting sa ntions; Dft Schwartz, John Knox Village and Broad and Casse is awarded $5000 from the $15,000 sanction. The Clerk shall enter jgm accordingly. At this case was originally assigned to Magistrate Judge Marshall and the referral pertains to a ll pretrial proceedings, case referred back to Magistrate Judge Marshall for pretrial proceedings. ***SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FURTHER INFORMATION***. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 01/13/10.(LMF, ) Modified on 1/14/2010 (JEMB, MODIFIED TO INCLUDE REFERRAL TEXT).
December 2, 2009 122 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 118 Memorandum : Recommending that award of sanctions against pla totaling $15000 and $5000 allocated to each of the three moving dfts. ***SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FURTHER INFORMATION****. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J Marshall on 12/02/09. (LMF, )
September 3, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 101 . Motions to dismiss [46,60,62,63,68,69] are granted; these dfts are dismissed with prejudice & Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Motions for summary disposition [95,97) are granted. P las motion for an extension of time to respond 96 is denied. Pla is ordered to show cause as to why motion 86 & 94 should not be granted. Pla to show cause by filing a brief no later than 9/18/09. This case is referred back to Magistrate Judge J acqueline J. Marshall for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV 07-309-TUC-FRZ (JJM). ***See attached PDF for complete information.*** Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 9/3/09. (BAC, )
August 18, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 , 27 , 29 , 30 , 32 Motions to Dismiss Case as to specified dft's w/prejudice; granting 31 Motion to Dismiss Party as to specified dft's w/ prejudice; Clk to enter judgment as to dismissed dft's. Denying as mo ot 35 Motion for More Definite Statement; granting 41 & 66 Motions for Extension of Time; denying 42 & 71 Motions to Amend/Correct Complaint; denying 43 Motion for Default Judgment; adopting 87 Report & Recommendations. Pla is to show c ause as to why Dft Schwartz's motion for Rule 11 sanctions should not be granted by 8/31/09. Case is referred back to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J. Marshall for all pretrial proceedings & report & recommendation, all future filings shall be designated CV 07-309-TUC-FRZ-JJM. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/18/09.(JEMB, )
August 11, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending granting motions to dimsiss filed by dfts in action 46 60 62 63 68 69 without leave to amend; Granting 95 MOTION for Summary Judgment, Issue an Order to Show Cause 86 , dft Broad and Cassel's motin for sanctions 86 and santions 94 . Denying pla motion for extension of time to respond 96 . *******SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FURTHER INFORMATION****. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J Marshall on 08/11/09. (LMF, ) .
June 29, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to motions: Deny MOTION 71 for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint; Grant 30 Motion to Dismiss; Deny 43 MOTION for Default Judgment, Grant 41 MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to mtn to dismiss, G rant 31 MOTION to Dismiss Party Hon. Jan E. Kearney, Hon. Clark W. Munger, Hon. Kyle Bryson, Hon. Julie Connors With Prejudice, Grant 32 MOTION to Dismiss Case, Grant 27 MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction, Deny 42 MOTION to Amend/Correct re complaint, Grant 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to respond motions to dismiss and related motions, Grant 30 First MOTION to Dismiss Case for Lack of Jurisdiction, Deny as Moot 35 MOTION for More Definite Statement or For S ummary Disposition of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint, Grant 29 MOTION to Dismiss Case, Grant 26 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Alternatively, Motion for a More Definite Statement, Issue an Order to Show Cause 39 MOTION for Sanctions against pla, Cheryl Wells : Recommending that Motions to Dismiss be Granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J Marshall on 6/29/09. (LSI, ) Text Modified on 6/29/2009 to add a link (LSI, ). Modified on 7/8/2009 (CLJ, Reference to George J. Feulner as dft STRIKEN per 89 Order).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Kearney et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan E Kearney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark Munger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Bryson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?