Kimble et al v. Marvel Enterprises, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert Grabb and Stephen Kimble
Defendant: Marvel Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2008cv00372
Filed: June 27, 2008
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Glenda E Edmonds
Referring Judge: Glenda E Edmonds
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2010 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 Motion for Reconsideration. It is further ordered that the Court shall issue an Amended Order to correct the clerical error made in its September 8,2010 Order. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 09/22/10.(LMF)
June 3, 2010 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 94 First MOTION for Reconsideration. it is further ordered that within 10 days dfts shall file any revised Proposed Pretrial Order and objections to each others additional contested issued of law and fact. Pretrial Conference set for 8/2/2010 01:30 PM before Judge David C Bury. ***SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FURTHER INFORMATION ****. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 06/02/10. (LMF)
March 2, 2010 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 77 Report and Recommendations; denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 49 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 50 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting [ 51] Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. Withdrawing the reference from Magistrate Judge Ferraro; matter to be tried by Judge Bury. Joint pretrial order due 3/26/10. Signed by Judge David C Bury on 3/1/10. See attached pdf for complete information. (KMF)
December 2, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending the District Court: grant 51 Fifth MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Definition of "net product sales", deny 49 Third MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment First Counterclaim, deny 47 First MOTIO N for Summary Judgment 2nd Counterclaim, deny 48 Second MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Counterclaim #4, deny 50 Fourth MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Third counterclaim, grant 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment. All written objections due within 14 days of being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation and should include the following case number: CV 08-372-TUC-DCB. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 12/2/09. (SSU, )
June 27, 2008 1
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20083621 Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 09700000000002041321, filed by Marvel Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index-Exhibits, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Supplement Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Jacobs, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble et al v. Marvel Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Grabb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Kimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvel Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Katharyn Jezairian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?