Shields et al v. Receivable Management Services (RMS)

Plaintiff: Margarette Shields and Michael Shields
Defendant: Receivable Management Services (RMS)
Case Number: 4:2009cv00084
Filed: February 11, 2009
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Referring Judge: D Thomas Ferraro
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 22 Report and Recommendations; granting 13 Motion to Set Aside default & default jgm; matter referred back to Magistrate Judge Ferraro. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 12/16/09.(KMF, )
November 4, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 13 MOTION to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment: Recommending Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Default and Default Judgment and Reopen the Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 11/4/09. (LSI, )
August 14, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Margarette Shields, Michael Shields against Receivable Management Services (RMS). Plaintiffs awarded damages in the amount of $1,000.00, attorney's fees of $3,207.50 and costs of $390.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge D Thomas Ferraro on 8/13/09. (SSU, ) DOCUMENT TYPE MODIFIED TO OPINION. Modified on 8/14/2009 (SSU, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields et al v. Receivable Management Services (RMS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarette Shields
Represented By: Ryan Scott Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Shields
Represented By: Ryan Scott Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receivable Management Services (RMS)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?