McCoy v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Jerry Dean McCoy
Respondent: Charles Ryan and Arizona Attorney General
Case Number: 4:2010cv00052
Filed: January 25, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Referring Judge: Glenda E Edmonds
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 18, 2011 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 22 Report and Recommendations.It is further ordered Petitioners petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus(Doc. 1) is denied without leave to amend, and this action is dismissed with prejudice, and the Clerk should enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 11/18/11.(LMF)
August 9, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denying 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State/2254) filed by Jerry Dean McCoy. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this report and recommendation to the petitioner and the respondents (see attached pdf for further information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 08/09/11. (LMF) Modified on 8/9/2011 to add with opinion (LMF).
July 9, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Recommending that it be dismissed. Parties may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 7/9/10. (SSU) Modified on 7/9/2010 to correct document type to WO(SSU).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCoy v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jerry Dean McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles Ryan
Represented By: Diane Leigh Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?