Kouba v. Renzenberger, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Albert Walter Kouba and Frank Weber
Defendant: Karen M Seitter, William M Smith, Phil Simco and Renzenberger, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2010cv00159
Filed: March 15, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Frank R Zapata
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2013 219 Opinion or Order of the Court IT IS HEREBY ORDERED as follows: Magistrate Judge Bowmans Report and Recommendation Doc. 216 is accepted and adopted and the second motion for summary judgment Doc. 181 is denied as moot. This case shall remain on referral to Magistrate Judge Bo wman and the parties shall file their revised motions in limine and revised proposed joint pretrial order within 30days of the filing date of this Order as previously ordered by Magistrate JudgeBowman. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 2/6/13.(KAD)
February 6, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 131 MOTION to Deny Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ; striking 135 MOTION re: Plaintiff's Motion to Addendum a Few Sta tements and Exhibits ; granting 137 Motion to Strike ; granting 143 Motion to Strike ; accepted and adopting Report and Recommendations re 146 Report and Recommendations, Renzenberger's motion is granted on sexual harassment claim and t he wages claim beginning January 1,2009. Partial summary judgment is granted on the wages claim before January 1, 2009 Kouba's damages cannot exceed $1,197, plus interest. Renzenberger's motion is denied on the on-call claim.; denying 154 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. The Clerk of the Court shall strike Kouba's motion to add an addendum and the addendum (Docs. 135,136), and strike Kouba's sur-reply(Doc.142). The Clerk of the Court shall strike Plaintiff's reply (Doc.155) to transcript from the record. Parties shall file a proposed Joint Pretrial Order on or before 3/9/2012. Case referred to Magistrate Judge Edmonds.. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 2/6/2012.(JKM)
December 21, 2010 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. 19 Report and Recommendations, 6 GRANTING Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Karen M Seitter, Phil Simco, William M Smith. As pretrial proceedings remain in this case, the referralk Magistrate Judge Edmonds remains in effect; the remaining parties shall continue to list the caption as: CV-10-159-TUC-FRZ-GEE.. Signed by Senior Judge Frank R Zapata on 12/16/2010. (KDT)
August 12, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denied as moot 37 Motion to Dismiss Party; adopting Report and Recommendations re 44 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Judge Frank R Zapata on 8/11/2010.(JKM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kouba v. Renzenberger, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen M Seitter
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M Smith
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Simco
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzenberger, Inc.
Represented By: Jeannie M DeVeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Walter Kouba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?