Zandonatti v. Colorado Federal Savings Bank et al
Plaintiff: David Zandonatti
Defendant: Red House Lending Incorporated, Quality Loan Service Corporation, EMC Mortgage Corporation, Unknown Parties and Colorado Federal Savings Bank
Case Number: 4:2010cv00441
Filed: July 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Presiding Judge: Glenda E Edmonds
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDERED that the Court adopts Magistrate Edmonds' 21 Report and Recommendations. Ordered granting 4 Motion to Dismiss and 14 Motion for Ruling. Further Ordered that the plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 12/14/10.(BAR)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court enter an order granting 4 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by EMC Mortgage Corporation and 14 MOTION for Ruling re Summary Ruling filed by EMC Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 11/23/10. (BAR)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 9 Motion to Remand to State Court; Court adopts Magistrate Judge's 18 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 11/16/2010. (GCP)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by David Zandonatti. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Glenda E Edmonds on 10/13/10. (BAR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zandonatti v. Colorado Federal Savings Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red House Lending Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Paul M Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Douglas Cameron Erickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Federal Savings Bank
Represented By: Steven T Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Zandonatti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?