Hanna v. Tucson Dodge Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Ariann J-Hanna
Defendant: Tucson Dodge Incorporated, Tucson Chrysler Jeep Incorporated, Chrysler Group LLC, Manheim Remarketing Incorporated and Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of San Francisco LLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv00504
Filed: August 17, 2010
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 189 Motion to Vacate the AAA Award. The Response to Tucson Dodge's Closing Brief (Doc. 208 ) is STRICKEN. The May 30, 2013, Award of Arbitrator (Docs. 184 -1, 188 -1, 192 -2) is CONFIRMED. J-Hanna is awarded no damages on any claim against Tucson Dodge. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment and shall then close its file in this matter. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 2/7/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
December 16, 2013 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of San Fransciso. As the Motion to Vacate the AAA Award (Doc. 189) remains pending, the Court declines to direct the Clerk of Court to enter judgment at this time. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/16/13.(SMBE)
May 31, 2012 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: granting in part and denying in part 103 MOTION Petition to allow plaintiff to notify court when expert witness has been decided and denying 96 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Discovery due by 10/1/2012. Dispositive motions due by 11/5/2012. Joint Settlement Status Report due by 7/1/2012 and every 3 months thereafter. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/30/12. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
October 5, 2011 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, The Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Enterprise (Doc. 30 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. J-Hanna's A.R.S. § 44-1212 and breach of warranty claims against Enterprise are DISMISSED. The Court declines to rule, at this time, on the Motion to Stay Case and Compel Arbitration filed by Tucson Dodge (Doc. 32 ). The Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Tucson Chrysler (Doc. 33 ) is GRANTED. The Motion for Extension of Time to File Response (Doc. 36 ) is GRANTED. The Motions to Strike (Docs. 39 , 47 , and 49 ) are GRANTED. J-Hanna's supplemental responses and addendums (Docs. 37 , 38 , 46 , 48 ) are STRICKEN. The Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Doc. 50 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall docket the Amended Complaint (Doc. 51 ). Enterprise shall file its Answer or other respond to the Amended Complaint within 20 days of this Order. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/4/11. (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hanna v. Tucson Dodge Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariann J-Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucson Dodge Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua J McClatchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tucson Chrysler Jeep Incorporated
Represented By: Joshua J McClatchey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Represented By: Negatu Molla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manheim Remarketing Incorporated
Represented By: Pamela Lynn Judd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company of San Francisco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?