Big Chuy Distributors & Sons Incorporated v. AG-Wise Incorporated

Plaintiff: Big Chuy Distributors & Sons Incorporated
Defendant: AG-Wise Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2012cv00109
Filed: February 17, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Santa Cruz
Presiding Judge: Glenda E Edmonds
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Bowman's Report and Recommendation 17 is hereby ACCEPTED and ADOPTED as the findings of fact and conclusions of law by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment 16 is GRANTED, and the Court awards Plaintiff $128,491.31 plus 0.11% interest. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that judgment be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 9/9/2013. (ALS)
August 8, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION the Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court, Grant the motion for default filed by Plaintiff on 5/22/2013 (Doc.16) and awarding Palintiff $128,491.31 plus 0.11% interest re 16 Application for Entry of Default.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 8/8/2013. (JKM) Modified on 8/8/2013 (JKM). To add WO information.
November 28, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. 14 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court adopts Magistrate Judge Bowmans Report and Recommendation (Doc. 14).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Motion for Default Judgment isdenied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Raner C Collins on 11/27/12. (KAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Chuy Distributors & Sons Incorporated v. AG-Wise Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Chuy Distributors & Sons Incorporated
Represented By: Suzanne Lorraine Diaz
Represented By: Todd Stephen Kartchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG-Wise Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?