Guerrero v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Guadalupe Guerrero
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2012cv00370
Filed: May 15, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion to Amend/Correct; the following trial witnesses and exhibits will be added to Defendants disclosures:WITNESSES: 1.Michael Presnall- U.S. Department of Homeland Security.EXHIBITS:1.Immigration A-Files, Criminal History Reports, and Biographical information of plaintiff and plaintiffs identified Mexican national witnesses.. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 4/30/15.
April 17, 2015 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time Deadline. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 4/17/15.
April 15, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court Pending before the Court is a document entitled ex parte motion for leave to amend final pretrial order. See Doc. 94. However, it appears that the motion was filed into the public record and that Plaintiffs counsel has already received an electronic notice and copy of the motion via CM/ECF. As such, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a response by 4/21/15, and the Government shall file a reply by 4/24/15.. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 4/15/15. (JAS, kr)
February 11, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion in Limine; denying 85 Motion in Limine; denying 86 Motion in LimineThe Court notes that it has also reviewed the parties Joint Proposed Pretrial Order (PTO). At this time, the Court has the following dates available for the trial in this case: 6/8/15; 6/15/15; 7/13/15; and 7/20/15. The parties shall consult with each other, and shall file a notice with the Court by 2/19/14 informing the Court what date is mutually agreeable for the parties. If none of these d ates work for the parties, by 2/19/14, the parties shall provide the Court with four mutually agreeable trial dates that start on a Monday (the earliest dates the Court is available for trial start in June of 2015).. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 2/11/15.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guerrero v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guadalupe Guerrero
Represented By: Richard J Gonzales
Represented By: Page A Pate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?