Ordinance Technologies Incorporated v. Raytheon Company

Plaintiff: Ordinance Technologies Incorporated
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Case Number: 4:2012cv00386
Filed: May 18, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 16, 2015 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to File Exhibits and Unredacted Briefs Under Seal 143 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall file the deposition transcript excerpts of Thomas Bootes, Matthew Buchanan, and Stephen Cardy, together with the unredacted version of Ra ytheon's Reply and Response to OTNA's Statement of Facts 146 and 147 UNDER SEAL. The Motion for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Third Claim for Relief 95 is GRANTED. The parties shall file a Joint Pre-Trial Statement as to th e pending counterclaim for a declaratory judgment on or before April 17, 2015. Alternatively, the parties shall submit a status report explaining why a Joint Pre-Trial Statement should not be filed at this time on or before April 17, 2015. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/13/2015.(ALS)
March 13, 2015 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant's Motion for Sanctions (Doc. 116 ) is GRANTED. OTNA and/or Elstein shall pay Raytheon's costs and attorneys' fees in the preparation and arguing of the Motion for Sanctions. Raytheon shall forthwith submit an affidavit of costs and fees to the Court. Elstein shall pay $2,500.00 to the Southern Arizona Legal Aid, Inc. as an additional sanction. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/13/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
February 26, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Ordnance's 42 Rule 56(d) Request for Continuance And/or Denial Of Motion is DENIED. Raytheons 35 Motion for Summary Adjudication of the First, Second and Fourth Through Tenth Claims for Relief and/or For Partial Judgment on the Pleadings is GRANTED. Partial summary judgment is awarded in favor of Raytheon and against Ordnance as to the First, Second, and Fourth through Tenth claims of the Complaint. Counsel shall submit a joint settlement status report to the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order. Raytheon shall refile document referred to in this order within 10 days of the date of this Order. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 2/25/14.(BAC)
January 27, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Raytheon shall respond to Ordnances request for production within 30 days of the date of this Order. In the event Ordnance has not narrowed its request, Ordnance shall provide a narrowed request by 1/31/14, and Raytheon shall res pond to the narrowed request within 30 days of service of the narrowed request. If Ordnance fails to provide a narrowed request by 1/31/14, Raytheon need not respond to the requests for production. Counsel shall forthwith schedule the depositions of those persons noticed by Ordnance on 1/21/13. Discovery deadline to complete depositions is extended to 2/28/14. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/27/14.(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ordinance Technologies Incorporated v. Raytheon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ordinance Technologies Incorporated
Represented By: Matthew C Elstein
Represented By: Molly Catherine Machold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raytheon Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?