Derr v. Astrue

Plaintiff: Rick Derr
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 4:2012cv00415
Filed: May 29, 2012
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Bernardo P Velasco
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 21, 2015 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 43 Motion for Attorney Fees Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, to the extent that Plaintiff is awarded the amount of $9,758.46 in attorneys' fees. Payment shall be made payable to Plaintiff and delivered to Plaintiff's attorney of record at his office: Patrick R. McNamara, Tretschok & McNamara, P.C., P.O. Box 42887, Tucson, AZ 85733-2887. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 12/18/15.(BAC)
October 9, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER entered Nunc Pro Tunc as of August 7, 2014. It is Ordered Defendant's decision denying benefits is REVERSED and this matter is REMANDED for an award of benefits based upon a finding of disability commencing November 1, 2007 an d REMANDED for further proceedings to determine whether Plaintiff's disability onset date occurred prior to November 1, 2007, as discussed within the body of this Order and with this Court's order granting in part the Commissioner' s motion to amend (Doc. 38 ). It is further Ordered that this Amended Order shall be filed nunc pro tunc as of August 7, 2014. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter an Amended Judgment and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 10/8/2014. (MFR)
August 7, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Defendant's decision denying benefits is REVERSED. The case is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 8/6/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Derr v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Derr
Represented By: Phillip B Verrette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?