Guido et al v. Mount Lemmon Fire District Featured Case

Plaintiff: John Guido and Dennis Rankin
Defendant: Mount Lemmon Fire District
Case Number: 4:2013cv00216
Filed: April 1, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 26, 2018 96 Received notice from the US Supreme Court re: 84 Notice of Appeal, the petition for writ of certiorari is granted. (KAH)
October 21, 2017 95 APPEAL DOCUMENT re: 84 Notice of Appeal. The petition for a writ of certiorari in the above entitled case was filed on October 18, 2017. (BAR)
August 29, 2017 94 Featured Case ORDER granting 91 Motion to Stay Proceedings. This Court stays all proceedings in this case pending the outcome of the Fire District's petition for certiorari to the United States Supreme Court. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/29/2017. (DPS)
August 25, 2017 93 STATUS REPORT Joint by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
August 25, 2017 92 RESPONSE to Motion re: 91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal to the United States Supreme Court filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
August 23, 2017 91 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Appeal to the United States Supreme Court by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matura, Jeffrey)
August 22, 2017 90 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Shannon Lori Giles. (Giles, Shannon)
July 13, 2017 89 Featured Case ORDER: By no later than 8/18/17, parties shall confer regarding how they wish to proceed (such as remaining deadlines) as to the remaining litigation in this case. By 8/25/17, the parties shall submit a status report as to how they wish to proceed in this case. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 7/12/17.(BAC)
July 11, 2017 88 MANDATE of USCA re: 84 Notice of Appeal filed by Dennis Rankin, John Guido. REVERSED and REMANDED for further proceedings. (Attachments: # 1 Opinion, # 2 NDA)(KAH)
January 13, 2015 87 Taxation Judgment in amount of $1,580.50 against plaintiff. Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Michael O'Brien on 1/13/15. (CSL)
January 9, 2015 86 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER of USCA re: 84 Notice of Appeal filed by Dennis Rankin, John Guido. (BAC)
January 9, 2015 85 USCA Case Number re: 84 Notice of Appeal. Case number 15-15030, 9th CCA. (BAC)
January 8, 2015 84 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: 82 Clerks Judgment, 81 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. Filing fee received: $ 505.00, receipt number 0970-11230569. (Giles, Shannon)
December 24, 2014 83 BILL OF COSTS by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Matura, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2014 82 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - It is ordered that that pursuant to the Court's Order signed December 11, 2014, dismissing the case with prejudice, judgment is hereby entered. Judgment shall enter in favor of the Defendant. (KAH)
December 12, 2014 81 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 71 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. This case is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment and close the file in this case. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/11/14. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
October 21, 2014 80 NOTICE re: Compliance by John Guido, Dennis Rankin . (Giles, Shannon)
October 16, 2014 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 71 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Awerkamp, Donald)
October 2, 2014 78 NOTICE re: Compliance by Mount Lemmon Fire District . (Matura, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2014 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re: 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Response to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 71 filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey) *Modified to add document linkage on 9/30/2014 (KAH).
September 15, 2014 76 NOTICE re: Compliance by John Guido, Dennis Rankin . (Giles, Shannon)
September 10, 2014 75 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 71 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, 74 Additional Attachments to Main Document, 73 Additional Attachments to Main Document, 72 Statement Plaintiffs Statement of Facts In Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment And Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 20)(Awerkamp, Donald)
September 10, 2014 74 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 71 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, 73 Additional Attachments to Main Document, 72 Statement Plaintiffs Statement of Facts In Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment And Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 15)(Awerkamp, Donald)
September 10, 2014 73 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 71 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment, 72 Statement Plaintiffs Statement of Facts In Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment And Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 10)(Awerkamp, Donald)
September 10, 2014 72 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs Statement of Facts In Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment And Plaintiffs Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re: 71 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index and Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5)(Awerkamp, Donald)
September 10, 2014 71 RESPONSE to Motion re: 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Denying Defendant Motion and Granting Cross Motion)(Awerkamp, Donald)
August 13, 2014 70 NOTICE re: of Compliance by Mount Lemmon Fire District . (Matura, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2014 69 STATEMENT of Facts to Support Its Motion for Summary Judgment re: 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents, # 2 Exhibit 1-9, # 3 Exhibit 10-16, # 4 Exhibit 17-21)(Matura, Jeffrey)
August 8, 2014 68 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matura, Jeffrey)
August 4, 2014 67 Featured Case ORDER: To avoid the appearance of impropriety by the Court or the parties and to preserve a proper record in the event of any appeal, all communication with the Court shall occur via a written motion filed into the official docket. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 8/1/14.(BAC)
July 25, 2014 66 OBJECTION re: 60 Statement Mount Lemmon Fire District's Objections to Plaintiffs' Rule 26(a)(3)(A) Pretrial Disclosure by Defendant Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2014 65 Due to the appointment of new district judges in the Tucson division, this case is hereby reassigned by the clerk to the Honorable District Judge James A. Soto. All future filings shall reflect the following case number CIV 13-00216-TUC-JAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ADI-MLH, )
July 15, 2014 64 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2014 63 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2014 62 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2014 61 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Rule 26(a)(3)(A) Pretrial Disclosure by Defendant Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 11, 2014 60 STATEMENT of Plaintiffs' Pretrial Disclosures by Plaintiffs John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
July 8, 2014 59 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 3, 2014 58 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
June 16, 2014 57 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2014 56 NOTICE of Deposition of Carol Mack - Second Amended, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
June 2, 2014 55 NOTICE re: Subpoena by John Guido, Dennis Rankin . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Giles, Shannon)
May 30, 2014 54 STATEMENT of Rule 26(a)(3)(A) Pretrial Disclosure by Defendant Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
May 29, 2014 53 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 29, 2014 52 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Guido. (Giles, Shannon)
May 29, 2014 51 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 21, 2014 50 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Jarrod Dorman - Amended, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon) *Modified to add amended on 5/22/2014 (BAC).
May 21, 2014 49 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Dan Leade - Amended, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon) *Modified to add amended on 5/22/2014 (BAC).
May 21, 2014 48 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Joe Gunia - Amended, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon) *Modified to add amended on 5/22/2014 (BAC).
May 21, 2014 47 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Dennis Cozzetti - Amended, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon) *Modified to add amended on 5/22/2014 (BAC).
May 21, 2014 46 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of Carol Mack - Amended, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon) *Modified to add amended on 5/22/2014 (BAC).
May 20, 2014 45 NOTICE of Deposition of Dennis Cozzetti, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 44 NOTICE of Deposition of Carol Mack, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 43 NOTICE of Deposition of Dennis Anderson, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 42 NOTICE of Deposition of Randy Ogden, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 41 NOTICE of Deposition of Jarrod Dorman, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 40 NOTICE of Deposition of Dan Leade, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 20, 2014 39 NOTICE of Deposition of Joe Gunia, filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 6, 2014 38 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
May 2, 2014 37 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions - Joint by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
May 2, 2014 36 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
April 14, 2014 35 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
April 7, 2014 34 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
March 24, 2014 33 Featured Case CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER pursuant to 32 Stipulation : At the conclusion of the litigation, the Confidential Information and any copies, shall be returned to the designating partys counsel. (See attached pdf for complete information). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/24/14. (SMBE)
March 17, 2014 32 STIPULATION for Entry of a Confidentiality Order by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Shannon)
March 10, 2014 31 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
February 27, 2014 30 NOTICE re: Service of Discovery Responses by Dennis Rankin . (Giles, Shannon)
February 26, 2014 29 NOTICE re: Service of Plaintiff John Guido's Response to Mount Lemmon Fire District's First Set of Interrogatories by John Guido . (Giles, Shannon)
February 21, 2014 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 27 Motion to Amend/Correct. The November 1, 2013 Scheduling Order is modified:Disclosure of Expert Opinions: May 2, 2014, Rebuttal Expert Opinions: May 30, 2014. All other deadlines shall remain the same. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 2/20/14.(SMBE)
February 19, 2014 27 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 19 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matura, Jeffrey)
February 4, 2014 26 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions - JOINT by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
January 31, 2014 25 NOTICE re: Service of Plaintiff John Guido's Response to Mount Lemmon Fire District's First Request for Production of Documents by John Guido . (Giles, Shannon)
January 29, 2014 24 NOTICE of Deposition of John Guido, filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2014 23 NOTICE of Deposition of Dennis Rankin, filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2014 22 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
November 27, 2013 21 *NOTICE of SERVICE of DISCOVERY Responses by Dennis Rankin . (Giles, Shannon) *Modified to reflect correct event type on 12/2/2013 (SMBE).
November 6, 2013 20 REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions - JOINT by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Giles, Shannon)
November 1, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING 18 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. IT IS ORDERED the 8/7/13 Scheduling Order is modified to include the following new dates: Disclosure of Expert Opinions due 3/7/14; Rebuttal Expert Opinions due 4/11/14; Fact Witness Disclosures due 5/30/14; Discovery Deadline due 7/11/14; Dispositive Motions due 8/8/14; Joint Pretrial Statement due 9/12/14. All other deadlines shall remain the same. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 10/31/13.(BAC)
October 24, 2013 18 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 14 Scheduling Order,, (First Request) by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Matura, Jeffrey)
September 30, 2013 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
September 10, 2013 16 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2013 15 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER: Discovery is due 3/4/2014; Dispositive motions due 4/3/14; Proposed Pretrial Order due 5/13/14; Status Report due 11/6/13, and every 90 days thereafter. Parties are granted until 9/12/13, to move to join additional parties or to amend pleadings. Designation of categories of expert witnesses shall take place by 9/30/13; Disclosure of initial expert testimony shall take place by 10/28/13; Disclosure of rebuttal expert testimony shall be completed by 12/6/13; Parties shall disclose names of all fact witnesses to be used at trial by 1/24/14. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/6/13.(BAC)
August 6, 2013 13 *MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/6/2013. (Court Reporter Mary Riley.) Hearing held 10:58 a.m. to 11:11 a.m.(JTA) *Modified to correct file date from (8/5/2013) to (8/6/2013); NEF regenerated on 8/6/2013 (CMAL).
July 30, 2013 12 NOTICE re Service of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosure Statement by Mount Lemmon Fire District . (Matura, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2013 11 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin: Notice of Service re Plaintiffs' First Request for Production of Documents and Electronically Stored Information upon Defendant on July 30, 2013. (Giles, Shannon)
July 30, 2013 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by John Guido, Dennis Rankin: Notice of Service re Plaintiffs' Initial Rule 26 Disclosure upon Defendant on July 30, 2013. (Giles, Shannon)
July 29, 2013 9 AMENDED DOCUMENT by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. Amendment to 8 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Awerkamp, Donald)
July 22, 2013 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Awerkamp, Donald)
June 28, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE for 8/5/2013 at 11:00 AM before Judge Cindy K Jorgenson. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Counsel shall file with the Court, on or before 7/29/13, a Joint Report. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/28/13.(BAC)
June 4, 2013 6 ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Mount Lemmon Fire District.(Matura, Jeffrey)
May 10, 2013 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Charles Matura on behalf of Mount Lemmon Fire District. (Matura, Jeffrey)
April 1, 2013 4 Summons Issued as to Mount Lemmon Fire District. (PAA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
April 1, 2013 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-7959334. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Cindy K Jorgenson. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:13-CV-00216-TUC-CKJ. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (PAA)
April 1, 2013 2 SUMMONS Submitted by John Guido, Dennis Rankin. (Awerkamp, Donald) (PAA)
April 1, 2013 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 0970-7959334, filed by Dennis Rankin, John Guido. (Awerkamp, Donald) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(PAA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guido et al v. Mount Lemmon Fire District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Guido
Represented By: Donald T Awerkamp
Represented By: Shannon Lori Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Rankin
Represented By: Donald T Awerkamp
Represented By: Shannon Lori Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mount Lemmon Fire District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?