Ibarra et al v. Kennedy Funding Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Margot Padres Elias, Luis Carlos Sanchez Gayou, Kristy Anne Shannon, Alberto Martin Sanchez Gayou, Martha Gayou Matiella and Alberto Sanchez Ibarra
Defendant: Lilia Lizeth Corrales, Ramon Alberto Fuentes, Fuentes Gomez and Associates LLC, Kennedy Funding Incorporated, Efrain Corrales, Cecilia Corrales, Jose Martin Fuentes and Unknown Fuentes
Case Number: 4:2013cv02371
Filed: December 19, 2013
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 26, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. 52 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Seal Document and 44 Motion for Attorney Fees are denied and all outstanding motions are denied as moot. The clerk is directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/26/2014. (BAR)
September 3, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court enter an order denying the 45 MOTION to Seal Document and plaintiffs' 44 MOTION for Attorney Fees. All outstanding motions should be denied as moot and the Clerk of the Court should be instructed to close the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 9/2/2014. (BAR)
June 16, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 42 Report and Recommendation; granting 13 Motion to Remand to State Court. This case remains referred to the Honorable Leslie A. Bowman for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 6/16/2014.(BAR)
May 12, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court, enter an order GRANTING the amended 13 motion to remand, filed by the plaintiffs on 1/22/14. If the action is remanded, the court may retain jurisdiction to permit the p laintiffs an opportunity to file a separate motion for attorneys fees and costs. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days of being served with a copy of this report and recommendation. If objections are not timely filed, the par tys right to de novo review may be waived. The Local Rules permit the filing of a response to an objection. They do not permit the filing of a reply to a response. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 5/12/14.(BAC)
February 26, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is Ordered that the Report and Recommendation (Doc. 23 ) is ACCEPTED AND ADOPTED as the findings of fact and conclusions of law of this Court. It is further Ordered that Defendant Kennedy Funding Inc .'s Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default (Doc. 7 ) is GRANTED. It is further Ordered Defendant KFI shall file its Answer, or otherwise respond, within 7 days of the filing of this Order and that Defendant KFI shall file its Response to the Amended Motion to Remand (Doc. 13 ) within 14 days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 2/26/2014. (MFR)
February 4, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re: 7 MOTION to Vacate Entry of Default filed by Kennedy Funding Incorporated. The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Court enter an order GRANTING the motion to set aside entry of default(Doc. 7 ), a nd grants Kennedy Funding 20 days within which to file an Answer and a response to the pending motion to remand (Doc. 13 ). Written objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 2/4/14. (SMBE) Modified to reflect written opinion on 2/4/2014 (SMBE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ibarra et al v. Kennedy Funding Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilia Lizeth Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramon Alberto Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuentes Gomez and Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Funding Incorporated
Represented By: Sean B Berberian(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cecilia Corrales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Martin Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Fuentes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margot Padres Elias
Represented By: Corey B Larson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert William Fischer, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: D Michael Mandig(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Carlos Sanchez Gayou
Represented By: D Michael Mandig(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey B Larson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert William Fischer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristy Anne Shannon
Represented By: D Michael Mandig(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey B Larson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert William Fischer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Martin Sanchez Gayou
Represented By: D Michael Mandig(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey B Larson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert William Fischer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gayou Matiella
Represented By: D Michael Mandig(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey B Larson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert William Fischer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Sanchez Ibarra
Represented By: D Michael Mandig(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Corey B Larson(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Robert William Fischer, III(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?