Alani v. Copenhaven

Petitioner: Martin Sanchez Alanis
Respondent: Copenhaven
Case Number: 4:2014cv00324
Filed: January 9, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Bruce G Macdonald (PS)
Presiding Judge: Raner C Collins
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 28, 2015 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 60 . Petitioner's First Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (Doc. 18 ) is denied. It is ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Sum mary Judgment is denied as moot. It is further ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Strike (Doc. 51 ) is denied and Petitioner's Motion for Waiver of Form Requirements (Doc. 58 ) is denied. It is further ORDERED the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this file and enter judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 9/4/15. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
June 17, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge enter an order: SUBSTITUTING J.T. Shartle, Warden, as Respondent for Charles E. Samuels, Jr. pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Rule 43(c)(2) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure; DENYING Petitioner's First Amended Petition Under 28 U.S.C. § 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (Doc. 18 ); DENYING AS MOOT Petitioner's Motion fo r Summary Judgment (Doc. 51 ); DENYING Petitioner's Motion to Strike (Doc. 51 ); and DENYING Petitioner's Motion for Waiver of Form Requirements (Doc. 58 ). See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 6/17/2015. (MFR)
March 5, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Magistrate Judge Macdonald's Report and Recommendation 39 is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED as the findings of fact and conclusions of law by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Default Judgment 33 is DENIED. This matter shall remain with Magistrate Judge Macdonald for a Report and Recommendation on pending dispositive motions. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 3/4/2015. (ALS)
January 9, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court TRANSFER ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sandra M. Snyder on 1/8/14. Case Transferred to District of Arizona. (Verduzco, M) [Transferred from caed on 1/9/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alani v. Copenhaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Martin Sanchez Alanis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Copenhaven
Represented By: Bureau of Prisons Regional Counsel
Represented By: Audrey Benison Hemesath
Represented By: Litigation Coordinator
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?