Tucson Embedded Systems Incorporated v. Turbine Powered Technology LLC

Plaintiff: Tucson Embedded Systems Incorporated
Defendant: Turbine Powered Technology LLC
Counter_claimant: Turbine Powered Technology LLC
Counter_defendant: Tucson Embedded Systems Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2014cv01868
Filed: February 26, 2014
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Bruce G Macdonald
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 11, 2016 138 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER (Amended at 3:11 pursuant to stipulation) granting 89 Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Tucson Embedded Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Arizona Trade Secrets Claim [Counterclaim Count Four]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 4/8/2016. (KEP)
March 31, 2016 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 89 Plaintiff/Counterdefendant Tucson Embedded Systems, Inc.'s Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Re Arizona Trade Secrets Claim [Counterclaim Count Four]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 3/31/2016. (See Order for details) (DPS)
September 23, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 25 Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants Motion for Declaratory Judgment or, Alternatively, for Preliminary Injunctive Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 9/19/14.(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucson Embedded Systems Incorporated v. Turbine Powered Technology LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tucson Embedded Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Donald Wayne Bivens(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Willis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbine Powered Technology LLC
Represented By: Peter Akmajian(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Represented By: Jeanna Chandler Nash(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Turbine Powered Technology LLC
Represented By: Peter Akmajian(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Thomas Delos Laue
Represented By: Jeanna Chandler Nash(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Tucson Embedded Systems Incorporated
Represented By: Donald Wayne Bivens(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jeffrey Lynn Willis(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?