Davis et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Becky Davis and Bobby Len Davis
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, Ford Motor Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC, John Crane Incorporated, Higbee Incorporated, Ingersoll Rand Company, Aurora Pump Company, Diamond Power International Incorporated, Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Carrier Corporation, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Viad Corporation, Asco Valve Incorporated, Robertshaw Controls Company, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, ITT Corporation, IMO Industries Incorporated, Viking Pump Incorporated, O.C. Keckley Company, Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company, Crane Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Keckley Manufacturing Company, Subaru of America Incorporated, Invensys LLC, AutoZone Incorporated, Honeywell International Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Arizona Boiler Company Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, CBS Corporation, Trane US Incorporated, Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Davis Engineering Company formerly known as Aqua-Chem Incorporated doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division successor in interest Davis Engineering Company, Viacom Incorporated, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC sued as successor-by-merger to successor in interest CSK Auto Incorporated doing business as Checker Auto Parts Incorporated, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Robertshaw Controls Company doing business as Fulton Sylphon Valves, ITT Industries Incorporated, Dial Corporation, American Standard Companies, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated sued individually and as successor in interest CSK Auto Incorporated doing business as Checker Auto Parts Incorporated, Allied-Signal Incorporated, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company doing business as Clark Reliance Corporation, Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products Incorporated and Aqua-Chem Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2014cv02288
Filed: August 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 471 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED, pursuant to the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/20/2018. (MCO)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER pursuant to #469 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims filed in this action be dismissed with prejudice as to Carrier Corporation only, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys'fees. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/20/2018. (MCO)
August 15, 2018 Filing 469 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Carrier Corporation by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER, after review of #467 Status Report - filed by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis, IT IS ORDERED a motion or stipulation to dismiss in light of the settlement shall be filed on or before October 31, 2018. Alternatively, Plaintiffs shall file a status report on or before October 31, 2018. The failure to file a dismissal document or status report may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 8/9/2018. (MCO)
August 6, 2018 Filing 467 *STATUS REPORT by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to add Bobby Len Davis on 8/7/2018 (MCO).
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 466 ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a Notice of Settlement as to Defendant Carrier Corporation (Doc. #465 ). No further filings have been made. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED a motion or stipulation to dismiss in light of the settlement shall be filed on or before 8/14/2018. Alternatively, Plaintiffs shall file a status report on or before 8/14/2018. The failure to file a dismissal document or status report may result in dismissal of this action. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 7/31/2018. (MCO)
June 7, 2018 Filing 465 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant Carrier Corporation by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 27, 2018 Filing 464 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Jordan Blumenfeld-James. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 463 ORDER granting #462 Stipulation: It is hereby ordered that the deadline for lodging the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order is June 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 3/29/2018. (SIB)
March 28, 2018 Filing 462 STIPULATION to extend time for lodging joint pretrial order by Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting #460 Stipulation: It is hereby ordered that the deadline for lodging the Joint Proposed Pretrial Order is April 10, 2018. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/29/2018. (SIB)
January 26, 2018 Filing 460 STIPULATION to extend time for lodging joint pretrial order by Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 459 ORDER that the November 9, 2017 Report and Recommendation (Doc. #454 ) is ADOPTED. Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #415 ) is GRANTED. Summary Judgment is awarded in favor of Defendant Crane Co. and against Plaintiffs Bobby Len Davis and Becky Davis. Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #421 ) is GRANTED. Summary Judgment is awarded in favor of Warren Pumps, LLC, and against Plaintiffs Bobby Len Davis and Becky Davis. Pursuant to the Scheduling Order issued in this case, see Doc. 378 , the remaining parties shall file a proposed pretrial statement/order on or before February 9, 2018. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/10/2018. (SIB)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall vacate the January 10, 2018, judgment issued in this case. The Clerk of Court shall also re-open its file in this matter. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/10/2018. (SIB)
January 10, 2018 Filing 457 OBJECTION PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO THE COURT DEEMING THE CASE CLOSED by Plaintiff Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 10, 2018 Filing 456 *VACATED by #458 - CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that, pursuant to the Court's Order filed January 10, 2018, which granted the Motions for Summary Judgment, judgment is entered in favor of defendants Crane Co. and Warren Pumps, LLC, against plaintiff. Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed. (SIB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (SIB).
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 455 *VACATED by #458 - ORDER that the November 9, 2017 Report and Recommendation (Doc. #454 ) is ADOPTED. Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #415 ) is GRANTED. Summary Judgment is awarded in favor of Defendant Crane Co. and against Plaintiffs Bobby Len Davis and Becky Davis. Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #421 ) is GRANTED. Summary Judgment is awarded in favor of Warren Pumps, LLC, and against Plaintiffs Bobby Len Davis and Becky Davis. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment and shall then close its file in this matter. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/10/2018. (SIB) Modified on 1/11/2018 (SIB).
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 454 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Court GRANT Defendant Crane Co.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #415 ) and Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #421 ). Any party may serve and file written objections within fourteen days of being served with a copy of the Report and Recommendation (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 11/9/2017. (MFR)
September 28, 2017 Filing 453 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Motion Hearing held on 9/28/2017. Parties present oral argument. The Court takes #415 Motion for Summary Judgment & #421 Motion for Summary Judgment under advisement. APPEARANCES: Jordan Blumenfeld-James & Peter Akmajian for Plaintiffs: Becky & Bobby Len Davis. John Hendricks for Defendants: Carrier Corporation, Crane Company & Warren Pumps LLC. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 1:32 pm to 2:38 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
September 28, 2017 Filing 452 NOTICE of Settlement as to Defendant THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
September 28, 2017 Filing 451 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Akmajian on behalf of Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Akmajian, Peter)
September 28, 2017 Filing 450 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Dev Kumar Sethi. (Sethi, Dev)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 449 Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, IT IS ORDERED the motion hearing for #415 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company, #421 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps LLC presently set for 09/27/17, is VACATED and RESET. Motion Hearing reset for 9/28/2017, at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. (LCK, hm)( This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 448 ORDERED that the Request for Oral Argument #447 is GRANTED. Motion Hearing regarding Defendants' motions for summary judgment [415, 421] set for 9/27/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/5/17.(CKS)
June 20, 2017 Filing 447 *MOTION for Hearing on Motion re: #415 Motion for Summary Judgment Request for Oral Argument by Defendant Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to correct event type and create reference to related document on 6/21/2017 (DPS).
June 19, 2017 Filing 446 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 19, 2017 Filing 445 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #415 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 444 ORDER granting #440 Stipulation of Dismissal: It is ordered dismissing Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company only with Prejudice as to all of Plaintiff's claims in their April 20, 2015 Amended Complaint for any alleged exposure post 1973, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/9/2017. (SIB)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 443 ORDER granting #438 Stipulation of Dismissal: It is hereby ordered that all claims filed in this action be dismissed without prejudice as to HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC. f/k/a ALLIED-SIGNAL, INC. (sued as successor-in-interest to BENDIX CORPORATION), only, with each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/9/2017. (SIB)
June 9, 2017 Filing 442 NOTICE of Settlement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
June 9, 2017 Filing 441 NOTICE of Errata re: #440 Stipulation of Dismissal by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hoffman, Stephen)
June 9, 2017 Filing 440 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Stephen)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 439 ORDERED that the Stipulations for Extension of Time, documents #436 & #437 are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Crane Co. and Warren Pumps,LLC shall file their replies on or before 6/19/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 6/9/17. (CKS)
June 8, 2017 Filing 438 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Honeywell International, Inc. by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 7, 2017 Filing 437 STIPULATION to extend time to submit reply in support of motion for summay judgment by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 7, 2017 Filing 436 STIPULATION to extend time for reply in support of motion for summary judgment by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
June 5, 2017 Remark: Pro hac motion granted for Nectaria Belantis on behalf of Becky and Bobby Len Davis. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 435 ORDER for Dismissal Without Prejudice of Defendant The Pep Boys - Manny Moe & Jack of California pursuant to #430 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 6/1/2017. (See Order for details) (DPS)
May 26, 2017 Filing 434 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #433 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment Crane Co. by Plaintiff Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 26, 2017 Filing 433 RESPONSE to Motion re: #415 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JORDAN BLUMENFELD-JAMES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT CRANE CO.S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C Part 1 of 4, #5 Exhibit C Part 2 of 4, #6 Exhibit C Part 3 of 4, #7 Exhibit C Part 4 of 4, #8 Exhibit D, #9 Exhibit E, #10 Exhibit F, #11 Exhibit G, #12 Exhibit H, #13 Exhibit I, #14 Exhibit J, #15 Exhibit K, #16 Exhibit L, #17 Exhibit M, #18 Exhibit N, #19 Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit P, #21 Exhibit Q, #22 Exhibit R, #23 Exhibit S, #24 Exhibit T, #25 Exhibit U, #26 Exhibit V, #27 Exhibit W)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 26, 2017 Filing 432 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #431 Response to Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 26, 2017 Filing 431 RESPONSE to Motion re: #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 DECLARATION OF JORDAN BLUMENFELD-JAMES IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WARREN PUMPS, LLCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D Part 1 of 5, #6 Exhibit D Part 2 of 5, #7 Exhibit D Part 3 of 5, #8 Exhibit D Part 4 of 5, #9 Exhibit D Part 5 of 5, #10 Exhibit E, #11 Exhibit F, #12 Exhibit G, #13 Exhibit H, #14 Exhibit I)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 26, 2017 Filing 430 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT THE PEP BOYS - MANNY MOE & JACK OF CALIFORNIA by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 429 ORDER granting #428 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' response papers to Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's motion for summary judgment shall be filed and served on or before June 9, 2017; and Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's reply papers shall be filed and served on or before June 23, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 5/24/2017. (DPS)
May 24, 2017 Filing 428 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFFS TO FILE A RESPONSE TO THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANYS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER re: #426 Stipulation to Dismiss Certain Claims Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 5/24/2017. (See Order for details) (DPS)
May 22, 2017 Filing 426 STIPULATION re: #189 Amended Complaint by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hoffman, Stephen)
May 1, 2017 Filing 425 NOTICE of Errata re: #420 Statement of Facts by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Hoffman, Stephen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 424 Joinder in Honeywell International, Inc.s Motion Pursuant To FRE 702 To Exclude Expert Witness Testimony by Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
April 28, 2017 Filing 423 MOTION Exclude Expert Witness Testimony by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17)(Sparks, J)
April 28, 2017 Filing 422 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #421 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I (1 OF 6), #10 Exhibit I (2 OF 6), #11 Exhibit I (3 OF 6), #12 Exhibit I (4 OF 6), #13 Exhibit I (5 OF 6), #14 Exhibit I (6 OF 6), #15 Exhibit J)(Hendricks, John)
April 28, 2017 Filing 421 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
April 28, 2017 Filing 420 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #419 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Hoffman, Stephen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 419 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
April 28, 2017 Filing 418 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #417 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Murphy, Robert)
April 28, 2017 Filing 417 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
April 28, 2017 Filing 416 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #415 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Hendricks, John)
April 28, 2017 Filing 415 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
April 27, 2017 Filing 414 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #413 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Sparks, J)
April 27, 2017 Filing 413 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
March 27, 2017 Filing 412 NOTICE of Deposition of LAURA DOLAN, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 411 ORDERED that the Stipulation #410 is GRANTED. The parties may conduct the Deposition of Dr. Richard Kradin on 3/28/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 3/24/17. (CKS)
March 23, 2017 Filing 410 STIPULATION to Conduct the Deposition of Dr. Richard Kradin After the March 24, 2017 Deadline by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PFO re Depo of Dr. Kradin After 03.24.2017 Dline)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 20, 2017 Filing 409 *NOTICE of Deposition of DONNA RINGO, filed by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to reflect correct filers on 3/21/2017 (DPS).
March 20, 2017 Filing 408 NOTICE of Deposition of Richard Kradin, filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 407 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #406 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (KAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 17, 2017 Filing 406 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Allen Eraut on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (KAS)
March 17, 2017 Filing 405 NOTICE of Deposition of DONNA RINGO, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 17, 2017 Filing 404 NOTICE of Deposition of ADMIRAL ROGER B. HORNE, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 17, 2017 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX183362 as to Allen Eraut. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS)
March 15, 2017 Filing 403 NOTICE of Deposition of SAMUEL A. FORMAN, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #401 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 9, 2017 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX182994 as to David C Hunter, III. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 8, 2017 Filing 401 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney David C Hunter II on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (BAS)
March 8, 2017 Filing 400 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Richard Kradin, filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Subpoena)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 6, 2017 Filing 399 NOTICE of Deposition of MICHAEL GRAHAM, M.D., filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 6, 2017 Filing 398 NOTICE of Deposition of DAVID P. SARGENT, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 397 NOTICE of Deposition of LEROY S. FLETCHER, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 396 NOTICE of Deposition of DAVID WEILL, M.D., filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 395 NOTICE of Deposition of CATHERINE E. SIMMONS, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 394 NOTICE of Deposition of LUCIAN RADU CHIRIEAC, M.D., filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 393 NOTICE of Deposition of PATRICK A. HESSEL, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 1, 2017 Filing 392 NOTICE of Deposition of THOMAS F. McCAFFERY, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 27, 2017 Filing 391 *AMENDED NOTICE of Deposition of David Sicilia, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) *Modified to add amended on 2/28/2017 (BAC).
February 24, 2017 Filing 390 NOTICE re: Cancellation of Deposition by Crane Company re: #381 Amended Document (NOT Motion/Complaint), #379 Notice of Deposition of Dr. Arnold Brody. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #388 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
February 24, 2017 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX182484 as to Gerald Fabiano. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 23, 2017 Filing 388 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gerald Fabiano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (BAS)
February 23, 2017 Filing 387 NOTICE of Deposition of LAURA DOLAN, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 21, 2017 Filing 386 NOTICE of Deposition of DONNA RINGO, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 21, 2017 Filing 385 NOTICE of Deposition of CHARLES BLAKE, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 21, 2017 Filing 384 NOTICE of Deposition of David Sicilia, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
February 17, 2017 Filing 383 NOTICE of Deposition of Captain Arnold Moore, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 17, 2017 Filing 382 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Crane Company. Amendment to #380 Notice of Deposition Steven Paskal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 17, 2017 Filing 381 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Crane Company. Amendment to #379 Notice of Deposition Dr. Arnold Brody. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 15, 2017 Filing 380 NOTICE of Deposition of Steven Paskal, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 15, 2017 Filing 379 NOTICE of Deposition of Dr. Arnold Brody, filed by Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subpoena)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
February 10, 2017 Filing 378 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Status Conference held on 2/10/2017. Plaintiff's Counsel requests a three week extension of the expert deposition deadline. No objection from Defense Counsel. The Court grants the request and extends the following deadlines: expert depositons due 3/24/17; dispositive motions due 4/28/17; joint proposed pretrial order due 5/26/17. If dispositive motions are filed, the proposed pretrial order shall be due 30 days following resolution of the motions. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jordan Blumenfeld-James for Plaintiffs. Telephonic appearance by John Hendricks for Defendants: Carrier Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC & Crane Company. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Hoffman for Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Telephonic appearance by Steven Sparks for Defendant: Honeywell International Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Robert S. Murphy for Defendant: Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 10:09 am to 10:16 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDERED confirming the Status Conference set for 2/10/17 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel shall call the following number to be added to the conference call: 888-240-3210; and enter the following access code: 9644693. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 2/7/17. (CKS)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDERED that the Stipulation #375 is GRANTED. The scheduling order is amended to set the following deadlines: Deposition of Expert Witnesses due by 3/3/17 and Dispositive motions due by 4/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 1/12/17. (CKS)
January 12, 2017 Filing 375 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines in Existing Scheduling Order [Doc 248] by Carrier Corporation, Crane Company, Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hendricks, John)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER pursuant to #368 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to IMO Industries, Inc., only: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing without prejudice, all claims in the above-entitled action against IMO Industries, Inc., only, with each party to bear its/their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/11/2017. (DPS)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER pursuant to #369 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (sued as successor-by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), only: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing with prejudice, all claims in the above-entitled action against Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (sued as successor-by merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.), only, with each party to bear its/their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/11/2017. (DPS)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER pursuant to #371 Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice as to AutoZone, Inc. Only: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED dismissing without prejudice, all claims in the above-entitled action against AUTOZONE, INC., only, with each party to bear its/their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/11/2017. (DPS)
January 10, 2017 Filing 371 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to AutoZone, Inc. Only by AutoZone Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Romano, Carol)
January 10, 2017 Filing 370 MINUTE ENTRY for telephonic Status Conference held January 10, 2017 before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C. Kimmins. The parties inform the Court this matter has been resolved with respect to Defendants Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, Autozone Inc., and IMO Industries Inc. Stipulations to dismiss will be filed shortly as to each of these Defendants. The parties have agreed to a thirty (30) day continuance of the remaining deadlines. The Court directs the parties to file a written stipulation to that effect. Status conference is set February 10, 2017 at 10:00 AM before this Court. TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES: Jordan Blumenfeld-James and Dev Sethi for Plaintiffs Bobby Len and Becky Davis; Carol Romano for Defendant Autozone, Inc.; John Hendricks for Defendants Crane Co.; Carrier Corp.; IMO Industries; Warren Pumps, LLC.; Stephen Hoffman for Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company; Anoop Bhatheja for Defendant Honeywell International, Inc.; and Robert S. Murphy for Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. Hearing is recorded by CourtSmart and held from 9:30 AM to 9:40 AM. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGF)
January 10, 2017 Filing 369 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Air & Liquid Systems Corporation (sued as successor-by-merger to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.) by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 10, 2017 Filing 368 STIPULATION of Dismissal by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDERED confirming Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. Counsel shall call the following number to be added to the conference call: 888-240-3210; and enter the following access code: 549102. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 1/5/17. (CKS)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER pursuant to #365 Stipulation of the parties; all claims filed in this action be dismissed without prejudice as to VELAN VALVE CORP., IMPROPERLY NAMED AS VELAN VALVE CORPORATION, only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 12/15/2016. (DPS)
December 14, 2016 Filing 365 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Velan Valve Corp. improperly named as Velan Valve Corporation by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER: Chief Judge Collins shall recuse himself from this case. This case has been randomly reassigned by the Clerk's Office to Judge Cindy Jorgensen. On all documents subsequently filed in this case, please substitute the initials CKJ after the case number so that the case number will read: CV 14-02288-CKJ-LCK. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 12/12/2016. (DPS)
December 8, 2016 Filing 363 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #362 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant AutoZone Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - "F")(Romano, Carol)
December 8, 2016 Filing 362 MOTION for Summary Judgment by AutoZone Incorporated. (Romano, Carol)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER that Defendants Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., f/k/a Atwood & Morrill and Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. are dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 12/2/2016. (SIB)
December 2, 2016 Filing 360 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Viking Pump Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
December 2, 2016 Filing 359 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Crown, Larry)
November 7, 2016 Filing 358 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AutoZone Incorporated. (Romano, Carol)
November 1, 2016 Filing 357 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AutoZone Incorporated. (Romano, Carol)
October 28, 2016 Filing 356 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 28, 2016 Filing 355 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 28, 2016 Filing 354 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 28, 2016 Filing 353 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Carrier Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
October 28, 2016 Filing 352 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
October 28, 2016 Filing 351 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
October 28, 2016 Filing 350 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
October 27, 2016 Filing 349 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AutoZone Incorporated. (Romano, Carol)
October 20, 2016 Filing 348 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
October 14, 2016 Filing 347 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Carrier Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #345 Stipulation of Dismissal: all claims filed in this action shall be dismissed without prejudice as to CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC., Erroneously Sued as Successor-in-Interest to Davis Engineering Company, only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 9/28/16. (KAH)
September 26, 2016 Filing 345 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to DEFENDANT CLEAVER-BROOKS, INC. by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 344 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims filed in this action be dismissed without prejudice as to VIAD CORPORATION f/k/a THE DIAL CORPORATION (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to GRISCOM-RUSSELL COMPANY), only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 8/23/2016. (DLC)
August 19, 2016 Filing 343 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Viad Corporation by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 15, 2016 Filing 342 NOTICE re: PLAINTIFFS AMENDED DISCLOSURE OF BANKRUPTCY FILINGS PURSUANT TO ARS 12-782 by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER granting #338 and #340 Stipulations to Dismiss Defendants Asco Valve, Inc. and Ruggles Klingemann MFG. Co. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Asco Valve, Inc. and Ruggles Klingemann MFG. Co. are dismissed without prejudice. Each party will bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 8/10/2016. (DPS)
August 9, 2016 Filing 340 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to defendant RUGGLES KLINGEMANN MFG. CO. by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 9, 2016 Filing 339 WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT re: #326 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Asco Valve Incorporated. (Salzer, Craig)
August 9, 2016 Filing 338 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to defendant ASCO VALVE, INC. by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 5, 2016 Filing 337 OBJECTION re: #336 Notice of Deposition of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Person Most Knowledgeable by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 3, 2016 Filing 336 NOTICE of Deposition of Warren Pumps, LLC., filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #331 , #332 and #333 Stipulations of Dismissal: Defendants Aurora Pump Company, Invensys LLC as successor to Fulton Sylphon Valves, and Jerguson Gage & Valve Company d/b/a Clark Reliance Corporation are dismissed without prejudice with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 7/28/2016. (DPS)
July 28, 2016 Filing 334 *OBJECTION and Responses to #316 Plaintiff's Second Amended Notice of Telephonic Deposition on Oral Examination of Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC's Person Most Knowledgeable by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) *Modified to create reference to related document on 7/29/2016 (DPS).
July 26, 2016 Filing 333 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to INVENSYS LLC as successor to FULTON SYLPHON VALVES by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 26, 2016 Filing 332 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to JERGUSON GAGE & VALVE COMPANY by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 26, 2016 Filing 331 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Aurora Pump Company by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER granting #318 , #319 , #322 , #323 , #324 and #325 Stipulations to Dismiss. Defendants Ingersoll Rand Company, Keckley Manufacturing Company (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Klipfel Valves, Inc.), O.C. Keckley Company (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Klipfel Valves, Inc.), O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated, and Trane US Incorporated are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 7/21/2016. (DPS)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 329 IT IS ORDERED that the Stipulation #321 is GRANTED. The deposition of Warren Pumps shall be completed by 8/4/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 7/18/16. (CKS)
July 18, 2016 Filing 328 MEMORANDUM in Support of #326 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Asco Valve Incorporated. (ONeill, Timothy)
July 18, 2016 Filing 327 STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #326 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendant Asco Valve Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Affidavit of Craig M. Salzer)(ONeill, Timothy)
July 18, 2016 Filing 326 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Asco Valve Incorporated. (ONeill, Timothy)
July 13, 2016 Filing 325 STIPULATION of Dismissal KECKLEY MANUFACTURING COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to KLIPFEL VALVES, INC.) by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 13, 2016 Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal O.C. KECKLEY COMPANY (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to KLIPFEL VALVES, INC.) by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 13, 2016 Filing 323 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Trane US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 13, 2016 Filing 322 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 12, 2016 Filing 321 STIPULATION to Conduct Corporate Representative Deposition by Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 320 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #314 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
July 12, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX173881 as to Edward Joseph White. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
July 11, 2016 Filing 319 STIPULATION of Dismissal O'REILLY AUTO ENTERPRISES LLC by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 11, 2016 Filing 318 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to O'Reilly Automotive Stores, Inc. by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 11, 2016 Filing 317 OBJECTION re: #311 Notice of Deposition of Buffalo Pumps PMK by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
July 11, 2016 Filing 316 NOTICE of Deposition of Warren Pumps, LLC., filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 8, 2016 Filing 315 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Benjamin Robert Eid. (Eid, Benjamin)
July 8, 2016 Filing 314 *AMENDED First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward Joseph White by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(White, Edward) *Modified to correct motion type on 7/11/2016 (DPS).
July 7, 2016 Filing 313 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
July 7, 2016 Filing 312 First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward Joseph White by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(White, Edward)
July 6, 2016 Filing 311 NOTICE of Deposition of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
July 6, 2016 Filing 310 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Asco Valve Incorporated. (ONeill, Timothy)
July 6, 2016 Filing 309 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER pursuant to #307 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant: CBS Corporation shall be dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 6/30/2016. (DPS)
June 28, 2016 Filing 307 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant CBS Corporation by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen)
June 28, 2016 Filing 306 NOTICE re: Objections to Person Most Knowledgeable Deposition by Crane Company . (Hendricks, John)
June 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #304 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
June 24, 2016 Filing 304 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Judith Perritano on behalf of Warren Pumps LLC. (BAS)
June 24, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX173352 as to Judith Perritano. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
June 20, 2016 Filing 303 NOTICE of Deposition of Warren Pumps, LLC.'s Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 20, 2016 Filing 302 NOTICE of Deposition of Crane Co.'s Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 301 NOTICE of Deposition of IMO Industries, Inc.'s Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 300 NOTICE of Deposition of Ingersoll Rand Company's Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 299 NOTICE of Deposition of Warren Pumps, LLC.'s Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 298 NOTICE of Deposition of Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. f/k/a Atwood & Morrill's Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 297 NOTICE of Deposition of Carrier Corporation's Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 296 NOTICE of Deposition of Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.'s Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 295 NOTICE of Deposition of Crane Co.'s Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 294 NOTICE of Deposition of DEFENDANT AIR & LIQUID SYSTEMS CORPORATION (sued as successor-by-merger to BUFFALO PUMPS, INC.) PERSON MOST KNOWLEDGEABLE, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
June 9, 2016 Filing 293 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins: Status Conference held on 6/9/2016. The Court affirms deadlines. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jordan Blumenfeld-James & Dev Sethi for Plaintiffs: Bobby Davis and Becky Davis. Telephonic appearance by Steven Sparks for Defendants: Air & Liquid Systems Corportation, Honeywell International Incorporated, ITT Corporation & VIAD Corporation. Telephonic appearance by James Scadden for Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. Telephonic appearance by Timothy O'Neill for Defendant: ASCO Valve Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Elan Mizrahi for Larry Crown for Defendants: Aurora Pump Company, Invensys LLC, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Viking Pump Incorporated & Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Kathleen Kahn for Defendant: CBS Corporation. Telephonic appearance by Barret Marshall for Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Kathleen Beiermeister for Defendants: Carrier Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation & Warren Pumps LLC. Telephonic appearance by Jason Boblick for Defendants: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated & O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. Telephonic appearance by Robert Murphy for Defendant: Pep Boys - Manny Moe & Jack of California. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Hoffman for Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Telephonic appearance by Benjamin Eid for Defendants: Keckley Manufacturing Company and O.C. Keckley Company. Telephonic appearance by Carol Romano for Defendant: AutoZone Incorporated. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 1:11 pm to 1:24 pm. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: The Status Conference set for June 9, 2016, will be held telephonically at 1:00 PM (rather than the previously scheduled 9:30 AM). Counsel are directed to email the undersigned's law clerk no later than June 7, 2016, to notify the Court as to which counsel will appear on the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins on 5/31/2016. (See Order for details) (DPS)
May 12, 2016 Filing 291 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by David Lee Stout, counsel for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
May 12, 2016 Filing 290 NOTICE of Deposition of Robert Akins, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER granting #285 Stipulation of Dismissal of all claims as to Defendant ITT CORPORATION only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. All claims as to Defendant ITT CORPORATION are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 5/10/2016. (DPS)
May 10, 2016 Filing 288 MINUTE ORDER: Case referral reassigned to Magistrate Judge Lynnette C Kimmins. All future filings shall reflect the following case number: 4:14-cv-2288-RCC-LCK. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAR)
May 9, 2016 Filing 287 OBJECTION re: #284 Notice of Deposition by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
May 9, 2016 Filing 286 NOTICE by Crane Company re: #280 Notice of Deposition of Goodyear Corporate Representative - Postponement of Deposition. (Hendricks, John)
May 5, 2016 Filing 285 STIPULATION of Dismissal by ITT Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
April 27, 2016 Filing 284 NOTICE of Deposition of OF THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY'S PMK, filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 18, 2016 Filing 283 OBJECTION re: #280 Notice of Deposition, #282 Additional Attachments to Main Document, #281 Additional Attachments to Main Document by Defendant Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
March 24, 2016 Filing 282 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #280 Notice of Deposition, #281 Additional Attachments to Main Document - Exhibit A to Notice by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
March 23, 2016 Filing 281 Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #280 Notice of Deposition - Corrected Service List by Defendant Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
March 23, 2016 Filing 280 NOTICE of Deposition of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's Person Most Knowledgeable, filed by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
March 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #278 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 15, 2016 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX169654 as to George William Freeman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
March 14, 2016 Filing 278 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney George William Freeman on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
February 22, 2016 Filing 277 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Lori Ann Zirkle; C Megan Fischer and Amanda Emily Heitz, counsel for Defendant Subaru of America Incorporated. (Zirkle, Lori)
February 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company Doc. #275 . All claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice as to Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 2/19/2016. (DLC)
February 9, 2016 Filing 275 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
January 12, 2016 Filing 274 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Kathleen Kelly Kahn. (Kahn, Kathleen)
December 18, 2015 Filing 273 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
December 18, 2015 Filing 272 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
December 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 271 ORDER Defendant Subaru of America is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(A) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the each party will bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 12/3/2015. (DLC)
November 24, 2015 Filing 270 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Crane Company. (Hendricks, John)
November 18, 2015 Filing 269 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
November 11, 2015 Filing 268 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Subaru of America Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fischer, C)
November 11, 2015 Filing 267 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Carrier Corporation, Crane Company, IMO Industries Incorporated, Ingersoll Rand Company, Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company, Trane US Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #262 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #265 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
November 10, 2015 Filing 265 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Paul Saxon Guerriere on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER as to Davis et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al. IT IS ORDERED that the supplementation deadline for disclosures pursuant to A.R.S. 12-782 is extended from 1/29/16 to thirty days after the close of fact discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that motions under 12-782(H) shall be filed within 60 days after the revised supplementation deadline for 12-782 disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 11/10/15. (CKS)
November 10, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX164999 as to Paul Saxon Guerriere. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 4, 2015 Filing 263 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #262 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney P. Saxon Guerriere filed by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. Pro Hac Vice motion electronically filed by eligible out of state counsel for ineligible out of state counsel. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please resubmit motion in paper form with original certificates of good standing. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please file this original document in paper. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
November 4, 2015 Filing 262 AMENDED MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney P. Saxon Guerriere by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
November 3, 2015 Filing 261 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle: Status Conference held on 11/3/2015. Formal order to follow. APPEARANCES: Telephonic appearance by Jordan Blumenfeld-James & Dev Sethi for Plaintiffs: Bobby Davis and Becky Davis. Telephonic appearance by Steven Sparks for Defendants: Air & Liquid Systems Corportation, Honeywell International Incorporated, ITT Corporation & VIAD Corporation. Telephonic appearance by Timothy O'Neill for Defendant: ASCO Valve Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Elan Mizrahi for Larry Crown for Defendants: Aurora Pump Company, Invensys LLC, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Viking Pump Incorporated & Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Bressler for defendant: CBS Corporation. Telephonic appearance by Barret Marshall for defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by John Hendricks for defendants: Carrier Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation & Warren Pumps LLC. Telephonic appearance by Jason Boblick for defendants: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated & O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. Telephonic appearance by Robert Murphy & Bonnie Bertollini for defendant: Pep Boys - Manny Moe & Jack of California. Telephonic appearance by Amanda Heitz for defendant: Subaru of America, Incorporated. Telephonic appearance by Stephen Hoffman for defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. Telephonic appearance by David Stout for defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:38 am to 9:51 am. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (CKS)
October 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER setting a Status Conference for 11/3/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 10/23/15. (CKS)
October 15, 2015 Filing 259 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
September 21, 2015 Filing 258 NOTICE re: Notice Of Service Of Initial Rule 26 Disclosure Statement by Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company . (Hoffman, Stephen)
September 11, 2015 Filing 257 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Lynn Stein on behalf of Asco Valve Incorporated. (Stein, Amy)
August 28, 2015 Filing 256 NOTICE re: Notice of Service of Defendant AutoZone, Inc.'s Initial Rule 26(A)(1) Disclosure Statement by AutoZone Incorporated . (Romano, Carol)
August 27, 2015 Filing 255 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Eid, Benjamin)
August 26, 2015 Filing 254 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
August 26, 2015 Filing 253 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Carrier Corporation, Crane Company, IMO Industries Incorporated, Ingersoll Rand Company, Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company, Trane US Incorporated, Velan Valve Corporation, Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 26, 2015 Filing 252 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Asco Valve Incorporated. (ONeill, Timothy)
August 26, 2015 Filing 251 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 26, 2015 Filing 250 * Report- Rule 26(f) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated for Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Slaughter, Edward) *Modified to correct event type on 8/27/2015 (DLC).
August 24, 2015 Filing 249 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
August 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 248 SCHEDULING ORDER The parties abide by the following schedule and rules:Motions to amend the complaint or join additional parties shall be filed no later than 12/04/2015. Parties shall make initial disclosures no later than 08/26/2015. A Status Conference will be held 11/03/2015 at 9:30 a.m. Counsel may appear by telephone or in person at the Status Conference. Fact discovery on all relevant issues shall be completed by 07/15/2016. The Court will hold a telephonic Status Conference on 06/09/2016 at 9:30 a.m. All motions filed shall be filed no later than 10/30/2015. All remaining dispositive motions shall be filed no later than 03/03/2017. On 01/10/2017 at 9:30 a.m. this Court will hold a Status Conference to discuss anticipated dispositive motions and any expert witness issues and determine if any stipulations can be made by the parties. A joint proposed pretrial order shall be lodged by 05/05/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 08/19/2015. (See attached Order for complete information)(DLC)
August 17, 2015 Filing 247 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Jamie L. Halavais filed by Timothy G ONeill. (ONeill, Timothy)
August 12, 2015 Filing 246 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle: Scheduling Conference held on 8/12/2015. Status Conference set for 11/3/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Status Conference set for 6/9/2016 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Status Conference set for 1/10/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:36 am to 10:17 am.(CKS)
August 10, 2015 Filing 245 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Stout on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
August 7, 2015 Filing 244 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 5, 2015 Filing 243 NOTICE OF WAIVER OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE by Tophas Anderson, IV, counsel for Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
August 5, 2015 Filing 242 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen)
August 3, 2015 Filing 241 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Carol Marie Romano. (Romano, Carol)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2015 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. Out-of-state counsel may appear in person or telephonically. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED pursuant to Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the parties are directed to confer prior to the Conference. The parties shall prepare a Joint Case Management Plan reflecting the results of their discussion and file it with the Court on or before Friday, 8/7/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 6/26/2015. (See attached Order for complete information)(DLC)
June 25, 2015 Filing 239 NOTICE re: Substitution of Attorney by ITT Corporation . (Sparks, J)
June 2, 2015 Filing 238 STATEMENT of OC Keckley re Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendants Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Eid, Benjamin)
May 27, 2015 Filing 237 STATEMENT of Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California Re: Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
May 22, 2015 Filing 236 STATEMENT of ASCO Valve, Inc. re Rule 16(c) Requirement re Attendance at Scheduling Conference by ASCO Valve, Inc. by Defendant Asco Valve Incorporated. (Halavais, Jamie)
May 22, 2015 Filing 235 STATEMENT of Viad Corp Re Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
May 22, 2015 Filing 234 STATEMENT of to the Court Re Rule 16 (c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Conference by Defendant O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason)
May 22, 2015 Filing 233 STATEMENT of Honeywell International Statement RE Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J)
May 22, 2015 Filing 232 STATEMENT of Air & Liquid Systems Re Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Sparks, J)
May 22, 2015 Filing 231 STATEMENT of to the Court Re Rule 16 (c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Conference by Defendant O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. (Boblick, Jason)
May 22, 2015 Filing 230 STATEMENT of CBS Corporation Regarding Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen)
May 22, 2015 Filing 229 STATEMENT of Crane Co., Carrier Corporation, Imo Industries, Inc. and Ruggles Klingemann MFG Co.'s procedures to satisfy rule 16(c)'s requirement concerning attendance at the scheduling conference by Defendants Carrier Corporation, Crane Company, IMO Industries Incorporated, Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 22, 2015 Filing 228 STATEMENT of Warren Pumps' procedures to satisfy rule 16(c)'s requirement concerning attendance at the scheduling conference by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 22, 2015 Filing 227 STATEMENT of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Regarding Rule 16c Requirement Concerning Attendance At Scheduling Conference by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
May 22, 2015 Filing 226 STATEMENT of Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc. regarding Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
May 22, 2015 Filing 225 STATEMENT of Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Marshall, Hollingsworth)
May 22, 2015 Filing 224 STATEMENT of Subaru of America, Inc.'s Rule 16(c) Requirement Concerning Attendance at Scheduling Conference re: #190 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings by Defendant Subaru of America Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
May 22, 2015 Filing 223 STATEMENT of ITT Corporation re Rule 16(c) requirement concerning attendance at scheduling conference by Defendant ITT Corporation. (Murray, James)
May 22, 2015 Filing 222 STATEMENT of Ingersoll Rand and Trane U.S. Inc.'s procedures to satisfy rule 16(c)'s requirement concerning attendance at the scheduling conference by Defendants Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 22, 2015 Filing 221 STATEMENT of Velan Valve's procedures to satisfy rule 16(c)'s requirement concerning attendance at the scheduling conference by Defendant Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 21, 2015 Filing 220 STATEMENT of Plaintitiffs pursuant to the Court's Order of April 21, 2015 by Plaintiff Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #201 Motion to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counesl. IT IS ORDERED permitting the substitution of Larry Jay Crown for Viking Pump Incorporated in all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 5/19/15.(CKS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER granting #202 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED permitting the substitution of Larry J. Crown in all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 5/19/15.(CKS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #200 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED permitting the substitution of Larry J. Crown in all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 5/19/15.(CKS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 216 ORDER granting #199 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED permitting the substitution of Larry J. Crown for Jerguson Gage & Valve Company for all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 5/19/15.(CKS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER granting #198 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS ORDERED permitting the substitution of Larry J. Crown and the law firm of Titus Brueckner & Levine, PLC as attorneys of record for Aurora Pump Company in all further proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 5/19/15.(CKS)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER granting #213 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. IT IS ORDERED the deadline for Aurora Pump Company, Invensys LLC, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, Viking Pump Incorporated & Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated to answer the Amended Complaint is EXTENDED to 6/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 5/19/15. (CKS)
May 15, 2015 Filing 213 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #189 Amended Complaint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pacheco, Travis)
May 15, 2015 Filing 212 ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated.(Boblick, Jason)
May 15, 2015 Filing 211 ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC.(Boblick, Jason)
May 15, 2015 Filing 210 Defendant Trane U.S. Inc.'s ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Trane US Incorporated.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 209 Defendant Ingersoll Rand's ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 208 Defendant Ruggles-Klingemann Mfg. Co.'s ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 207 Defendant Imo Industries, Inc.'s ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 206 Defendant Carrier Corporation's ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Carrier Corporation.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 205 Defendant Warren Pumps' ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps LLC.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 204 Defendant Velan Valve Corp.'s ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corporation.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 15, 2015 Filing 203 Defendant Crane Co.'s ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
May 14, 2015 Filing 202 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Weir Valves & Controls, USA, Inc. by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pacheco, Travis)
May 14, 2015 Filing 201 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. by Viking Pump Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pacheco, Travis)
May 14, 2015 Filing 200 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Invensys Systems, Inc. by Invensys LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pacheco, Travis)
May 14, 2015 Filing 199 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Clark Reliance Corporation and its Jerguson Gage and Valve Division by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pacheco, Travis)
May 14, 2015 Filing 198 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Application to Withdraw and for Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Aurora Pump Company by Aurora Pump Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Pacheco, Travis)
May 8, 2015 Filing 197 Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company's ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Hoffman, Stephen)
May 6, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Subaru of America Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
May 4, 2015 Filing 195 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Edward M Slaughter. (Slaughter, Edward)
April 29, 2015 Filing 194 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Asco Valve Incorporated. (Halavais, Jamie)
April 29, 2015 Filing 193 ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint by Asco Valve Incorporated.(Halavais, Jamie)
April 28, 2015 Filing 192 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY'S CHANGE OF ADDRESS/FIRM NAME by Jordan Blumenfeld-James. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 28, 2015 Filing 191 ANSWER to #189 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by AutoZone Incorporated.(Romano, Carol)
April 20, 2015 Filing 189 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Becky Davis.(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
April 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #187 Stipulation. IT IS ORDERED that Carol Romano and Tophas Anderson IV are hereby WITHDRAWN as counsel for Ingersoll Rand and Trane U.S. Incorporated, and John C. Hendricks and Kathleen L. Beiermeister are SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 4/17/15. (CKS)
April 16, 2015 Filing 190 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle: GRANTING #183 Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint to State Claims for Wrongful Death. IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint by 4/24/15. Defendants' previously filed answers may stand as answers to Amended Complaint. Any counsel who choose to file answer to Amended Complaint shall do so by 5/15/15. Deadline for any party to file a Motion to Designate Case as Complex is 5/22/15. Mr. Pacheco and Mr. Crown shall have until 5/22/15 to clarify which defendants they will represent. Counsel shall file a short statement to the Court, either jointly or severally, by 5/22/15. Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/15 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. (Recorded by COURTSMART.) Hearing held 9:36 AM to 10:03 AM.(BAC)
April 16, 2015 Filing 187 STIPULATION Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel with Clients' Consent by Ingersoll Rand Company, Trane US Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
March 27, 2015 Filing 186 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D Hoffman on behalf of The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER pursuant to #184 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that all claims file in this action are dismissed without prejudice as to Ford Motor Company only, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 3/26/15.(BAC)
March 25, 2015 Filing 184 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Ford Motor Company by Becky Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 23, 2015 Filing 183 MOTION to Amend/Correct THE COMPLAINT TO STATE CLAIMS FOR WRONGFUL DEATH by Becky Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 182 IT IS ORDERED this matter is set for a Telephonic Status Conference on 4/16/2015 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5F, 405 West Congress Street, Tucson, AZ 85701 before Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on the date and time for telephonic status conference, counsel shall call the following number to be added to the conference call: 888-431-3632 and enter the following access code: 147632. Counsel is directed to email the undersigned's law clerk no later than noon on 4/15/15 to notify the Court as to which counsel will be appearing on the call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 3/12/15. (CKS)
March 11, 2015 Filing 181 *AMENDED DOCUMENT by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company re: #24 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (Hoffman, Stephen) *Modified to add document number on 3/13/2015 (ACL).
March 11, 2015 Filing 180 NOTICE re: Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.s Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated . (Irvin, Jason)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #178 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
March 10, 2015 Filing 178 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jason J Irvin on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
March 10, 2015 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX156289 as to Jason J Irvin. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
February 6, 2015 Filing 177 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Invensys LLC identifying Corporate Parent SIEB, Inc. for Invensys LLC. (Brophy, Joseph)
January 29, 2015 Filing 176 Joinder In All Filed Non-Parties At Fault by Defendants Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Eid, Benjamin)
January 28, 2015 Filing 175 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Aurora Pump Company. (Brophy, Joseph)
January 28, 2015 Filing 174 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Invensys LLC. (Brophy, Joseph)
January 27, 2015 Filing 173 NOTICE re: Notice of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated . (Slaughter, Edward)
January 22, 2015 Filing 172 NOTICE re: NonParties at Fault by Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 22, 2015 Filing 171 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
January 22, 2015 Filing 170 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
January 20, 2015 Filing 169 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant ITT Corporation. (Murray, James)
January 20, 2015 Filing 168 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Viking Pump Incorporated. (Pacheco, Travis)
January 20, 2015 Filing 167 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Pacheco, Travis)
January 20, 2015 Filing 166 NOTICE re: Joinder in Nonparties At Fault Notices Filed By Defendants CBS Corporation and Warren Pumps, LLC by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California re: #150 Notice (Other), #162 Notice (Other) . (Murphy, Robert)
January 20, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE re: Jerguson's Notice of Non-Party at Fault by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company . (Sticht, John)
January 20, 2015 Filing 164 NOTICE re: Nonparties at Fault by IMO Industries Incorporated . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 20, 2015 Filing 163 NOTICE re: Nonparties at Fault by Crane Company . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 19, 2015 Filing 162 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Warren Pumps LLC . (Hendricks, John)
January 19, 2015 Filing 161 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Party at Fault by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated Joinder. (Boblick, Jason)
January 19, 2015 Filing 160 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) by Defendant Subaru of America Incorporated. (Heitz, Amanda)
January 16, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE re: Identification Of Non-Parties At Fault by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company . (Hoffman, Stephen)
January 16, 2015 Filing 158 NOTICE re: Notice of Non-Parties at Fault by Ford Motor Company . (Larsen, Dan)
January 16, 2015 Filing 157 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) re Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Asco Valve Incorporated. (Halavais, Jamie)
January 16, 2015 Filing 156 NOTICE re: Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Non-Party at Fault by AutoZone Incorporated . (Romano, Carol)
January 16, 2015 Filing 155 NOTICE re: Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Non-Party at Fault by Trane US Incorporated . (Anderson, Tophas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 154 NOTICE re: Joinder in Defendant CBS Corporation's Notice of Non-Party at Fault by Ingersoll Rand Company . (Anderson, Tophas)
January 16, 2015 Filing 153 Joinder re: #150 Notice (Other) of Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
January 16, 2015 Filing 152 NOTICE re: Non-Parties at Fault by Velan Valve Corporation . (Hendricks, John)
January 12, 2015 Filing 151 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by Carrier Corporation . (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
January 12, 2015 Filing 150 NOTICE re: Identification of Non-Parties at Fault by CBS Corporation . (Kahn, Kathleen)
January 8, 2015 Filing 149 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Boblick, Jason) *Modified to add corporate parent on 1/9/2015 (LSP).
January 8, 2015 Filing 148 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. (Boblick, Jason) *Modified to add corporate parent on 1/9/2015 (LSP).
January 8, 2015 Filing 147 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
January 8, 2015 Filing 146 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company identifying Corporate Parent Clark Reliance Corporation for Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. (Sticht, John)
January 6, 2015 Filing 145 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by AutoZone Incorporated. (Romano, Carol)
January 6, 2015 Filing 144 MINUTE ORDER: The record reflecting that Jerguson Gage and Valve Company has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1, IT IS ORDERED that Jerguson Gage and Valve Company has until February 6, 2015, to make the required filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
January 6, 2015 Filing 143 MINUTE ORDER: The record reflecting that OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc. and OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. have not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1, IT IS ORDERED that OReilly Automotive Stores, Inc. and OReilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. have until February 6, 2015, to make the required filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
January 6, 2015 Filing 142 MINUTE ORDER: The record reflecting that Invensys Systems Incorporated has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1, IT IS ORDERED that Invensys Systems Incorporated has until February 6, 2015, to make the required filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
December 29, 2014 Filing 141 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Bobby Len Davis by Ford Motor Company. (Larsen, Dan)
December 23, 2014 Filing 140 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Bobby Len Davis by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 23, 2014 Filing 139 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal Louani A. Bascara filed by Louani A Bascara. (Bascara, Louani)
December 19, 2014 Filing 138 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Bascara, Louani)
December 18, 2014 Filing 137 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Ford Motor Company. (Martinez, Christopher)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER pursuant to #135 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant, Union Carbide Corporation is dismissed without prejudice from all claims filed in this action. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 12/15/14.(BAC)
December 12, 2014 Filing 135 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Union Carbide Corporation by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
December 9, 2014 Filing 134 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company. (Sticht, John)
December 9, 2014 Filing 133 Clark Reliance Corporation and Its jerguson Gage and Valve Division ANSWER to Complaint by Jerguson Gage & Valve Company.(Sticht, John)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Stipulation of Dismissal. It is Ordered that Arizona Boiler Company Incorporated is dismissed without prejudice, from all claims filed in this action, with each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 12/8/2014. (MFR)
December 8, 2014 Filing 131 STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Arizona Boiler Company, Inc. by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER granting #127 Motion to Substitute Attorney. IT IS ORDERED J. Steven Sparks is hereby substituted as counsel of record for defendant Air & Liquid System Corporation in the place and stead of David L. O'Daniel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the 9/10/14 Stipulation for Substitution of Counsel #74 is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 11/21/14.(CKS)
November 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER re: doc 126. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall have until 12/15/14 to file a stipulation and form of order for dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 11/21/14. (CKS)
November 20, 2014 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance by David Lee Stout on behalf of Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Stout, David)
November 19, 2014 Filing 127 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
November 14, 2014 Filing 126 NOTICE of Settlement by Union Carbide Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
November 5, 2014 Filing 125 MOTION for Disclosure by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC. (Shorall, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 124 O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC.(Shorall, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 123 MOTION for Disclosure by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated. (Shorall, Thomas)
November 5, 2014 Filing 122 O'Reilly Automotive Stores Inc's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated.(Shorall, Thomas)
October 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that John Crane, Inc. is dismissed as a defendant in the above matter. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 10/28/14.(BAC)
October 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #118 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #119 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 27, 2014 Filing 119 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Louani A Bascara on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
October 27, 2014 Filing 118 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Hollingsworth Barret Marshall Jr. on behalf of Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (BAS)
October 27, 2014 Filing 117 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
October 27, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sethi, Dev)
October 27, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 70, receipt number PHX151725 as to Hollingsworth Barret Marshall, Jr, Louani A Bascara. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
October 21, 2014 Filing 115 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Eid, Benjamin)
October 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER pursuant to #111 Stipulation: IT IS ORDERED that Invensys LLC as successor to Fulton Sylphon Valves is hereby substituted as a Defendant in this matter, in place of Invensys Systems, Inc. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a Fulton Sylphon Valves).The Clerk is directed to change this partys name in the electronic directory of parties appearing in this matter accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED dismissing Robertshaw Controls Company d/b/a Fulton Sylphon Valves without prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 10/16/14.(BAC)
October 16, 2014 Filing 114 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
October 10, 2014 Filing 112 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
October 10, 2014 Filing 111 STIPULATION by Invensys Systems Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Stovall, Christopher)
October 10, 2014 Filing 110 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Craig Aaron Logsdon. (Logsdon, Craig)
October 7, 2014 Filing 107 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Invensys Systems Incorporated.(Stovall, Christopher)
October 2, 2014 Filing 106 MINUTE ORDER: The record reflecting that Keckley Manufacturing Company and O.C. Keckley Company have not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1, IT IS ORDERED that Keckley Manufacturing Company and O.C. Keckley Company has until November 2, 2014, to make the required filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
October 1, 2014 Filing 109 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
September 29, 2014 Filing 105 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ITT Corporation. (Murray, James)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #99 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #100 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #95 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #96 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 29, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150740 as to Ronald Lyle Hellbusch. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 29, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150740 as to Mary Price Birk. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 29, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 70, receipt number PHX150739 as to John C Hughes, Heather Neubauer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 26, 2014 Filing 108 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
September 26, 2014 Filing 102 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viking Pump Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent IDEX Corporation for Viking Pump Incorporated. (Pacheco, Travis)
September 26, 2014 Filing 101 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Viking Pump Incorporated.(Pacheco, Travis)
September 26, 2014 Filing 100 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John C. Hughes by Crane Company. (Hughes, John)
September 26, 2014 Filing 99 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Heather H. Neubauer by Warren Pumps LLC. (Neubauer, Heather)
September 25, 2014 Filing 98 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
September 25, 2014 Filing 97 *ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Document not in compliance with LRCIV 7.1(c); attorney notified on 9/25/2014 (KAH).
September 25, 2014 Filing 96 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorney Ronald L Hellbusch to Practice Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary) Modified on 9/25/2014 (BAS).
September 25, 2014 Filing 95 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Attorney to Practice on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Birk, Mary) Modified on 9/25/2014 (BAS).
September 24, 2014 Filing 94 Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc. ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated.(Pacheco, Travis)
September 24, 2014 Filing 93 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent The Weir Group, PLC, Other Affiliate Atwood & Morrill for Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (Pacheco, Travis)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER pursuant to #80 Stipulation of Dismissal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products, Inc. shall be dismissed without prejudice from the above-entitled case, with the Parties to bear their own individual costs and attorneys fees. Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 9/23/14.(BAC)
September 24, 2014 Filing 91 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California. (Murphy, Robert)
September 24, 2014 Filing 90 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California.(Murphy, Robert)
September 24, 2014 Filing 89 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by ITT Corporation.(Murray, James)
September 23, 2014 Filing 88 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Eid, Benjamin)
September 23, 2014 Filing 87 NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company. (Eid, Benjamin)
September 23, 2014 Filing 86 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Keckley Manufacturing Company, O.C. Keckley Company.(Eid, Benjamin)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER: This case, reassigned to the Honorable Raner C. Collins, is hereby referred back to Magistrate Judge Charles R. Pyle for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and LRCiv 72.1, and 72.2 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Arizona. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-14-02288-TUC-RCC(CRP). Signed by Chief Judge Raner C Collins on 9/17/14.(BAC)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #83 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 15, 2014 Filing 83 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Craig M Salzer on behalf of Asco Valve Incorporated. (BAS)
September 15, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150368 as to Craig M Salzer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #81 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 12, 2014 Filing 81 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James G Murray on behalf of ITT Corporation. (BAS)
September 12, 2014 Filing 80 STIPULATION of Dismissal without Prejudice by Higbee Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Petri, Shawn)
September 12, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150316 as to James G Murray. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 10, 2014 Filing 79 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
September 10, 2014 Filing 78 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aurora Pump Company identifying Corporate Parent Pentair Incorporated for Aurora Pump Company. (Brophy, Joseph)
September 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #76 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 10, 2014 Filing 76 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Glen R Powell on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
September 10, 2014 Filing 75 ANSWER to Complaint by Aurora Pump Company.(Brophy, Joseph)
September 10, 2014 Filing 74 STIPULATION for Substitution of Counsel by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sparks, J)
September 10, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150241 as to Glen R Powell. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 5, 2014 Filing 73 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 5, 2014 Filing 72 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Viad Corporation. (Sparks, J)
September 5, 2014 Filing 71 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Union Carbide Corporation. (Crown, Larry)
September 5, 2014 Filing 70 ANSWER to Complaint of Bobby Len Davis and Beck Davis by Union Carbide Corporation.(Crown, Larry)
September 5, 2014 Filing 69 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Viad Corporation.(Sparks, J)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #67 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 4, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Samuel D Jubelirer on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
September 4, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX150027 as to Samuel D Jubelirer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #64 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #65 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
September 3, 2014 Filing 65 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney James G Scadden on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
September 3, 2014 Filing 64 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Michael J Pietrykowski on behalf of Air & Liquid Systems Corporation. (BAS)
September 3, 2014 Filing 63 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J) *Modified to add corporate pareent on 9/4/2014 (LSP).
September 3, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149963 as to Michael J Pietrykowski. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 3, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149962 as to James G Scadden. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
September 2, 2014 Filing 62 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
September 2, 2014 Filing 61 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Slaughter, Edward)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #56 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 29, 2014 Filing 59 ANSWER to Complaint by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated.(Slaughter, Edward)
August 29, 2014 Filing 58 MINUTE ORDER: The record reflecting that Honeywell International Incorporated has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1, IT IS ORDERED that Honeywell International Incorporated has until September 29, 2014, to make the required filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
August 29, 2014 Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER: The record reflecting that Higbee Incorporated has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1, IT IS ORDERED that Higbee Incorporated has until September 29, 2014, to make the required filing. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SSG)
August 29, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149843 as to Edward M Slaughter. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 28, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Edward M. Slaughter by Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing from USDC Northern District of Texas, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice)(Slaughter, Edward)
August 27, 2014 Filing 55 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll Rand Company for Trane US Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 54 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AutoZone Incorporated. (Anderson, Tophas)
August 27, 2014 Filing 53 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll Rand Company. (Anderson, Tophas)
August 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #51 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 27, 2014 Filing 51 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jennifer L Bartlett on behalf of Becky Davis, and Bobby Len Davis. (BAS)
August 27, 2014 Filing 50 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 49 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.8(a), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. Case reassigned by random draw to Chief Judge Raner C Collins. All further pleadings should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV14-02288-TUC-RCC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 47 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 46 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 45 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 44 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 Filing 43 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SGG)
August 27, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149766 as to Jennifer Lynn Bartlett. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating #22 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #34 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 26, 2014 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Trane US Incorporated.(Anderson, Tophas)
August 26, 2014 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Ingersoll Rand Company.(Anderson, Tophas)
August 26, 2014 Filing 39 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by AutoZone Incorporated.(Anderson, Tophas)
August 26, 2014 Filing 38 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Incorporated.(Sparks, J)
August 26, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149710 as to Jordan Blumenfeld-James. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 25, 2014 Filing 37 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen) *Modified to add corporate parents on 8/26/2014 (LSP).
August 25, 2014 Filing 36 Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant CBS Corporation. (Kahn, Kathleen)
August 25, 2014 Filing 35 Magistrate Election Form Deadline. (Attachments: #1 Instructions)(SGG)
August 22, 2014 Filing 34 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jordan Blumenfeld-James by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 22, 2014 Filing 33 *Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sparks, J) *Modified to reflect document filed with incorrect case number (C2014-3880)on 8/25/2014 (SMBE).
August 22, 2014 Filing 32 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Pumps LLC. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to add corporate parents on 8/28/2014 (LSP).
August 22, 2014 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Warren Pumps LLC.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 22, 2014 Filing 30 Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C part 1, #4 Exhibit C part 2, #5 Exhibit D part 1, #6 Exhibit D part 2, #7 Exhibit D part 3, #8 Exhibit D part 4, #9 Exhibit D part 5, #10 Exhibit D part 6, #11 Exhibit D part 7, #12 Exhibit D part 8, #13 Exhibit D part 9, #14 Exhibit D part 10, #15 Exhibit D part 11, #16 Exhibit D part 12, #17 Exhibit D part 13, #18 Exhibit D part 14, #19 Exhibit D part 15, #20 Exhibit E part 1, #21 Exhibit E part 2, #22 Exhibit E part 3, #23 Exhibit E part 4, #24 Exhibit E part 5, #25 Exhibit E part 6, #26 Exhibit E part 7, #27 Exhibit E part 8, #28 Exhibit E part 9, #29 Exhibit E part 10, #30 Exhibit E part 11, #31 Exhibit E part 12, #32 Exhibit E part 13, #33 Exhibit E part 14, #34 Exhibit E part 15)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER pursuant to #17 Stipulation : Higbee Incorporated responsive pleading due 9/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles R Pyle on 8/22/14. (SMBE)
August 22, 2014 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(O'Daniel, David)
August 22, 2014 Filing 27 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Asco Valve Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Emerson Electric Company for Asco Valve Incorporated. (Halavais, Jamie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint by Asco Valve Incorporated.(Halavais, Jamie)
August 22, 2014 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jordan Blumenfeld-James filed by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. Pro Hac Vice motion submitted with State Court certificate of good standing. Please resubmit motion certificates of good standing from federal court. Deficiency must be corrected within seven business days of this notice This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 22, 2014 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
August 22, 2014 Filing 23 DEFENDANT'S DEMAND for Jury Trial by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Hoffman, Stephen)
August 22, 2014 Filing 22 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jordan Blumenfeld-James by Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis. (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
August 22, 2014 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company.(Hoffman, Stephen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crane Company. (Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Crane Company.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 18 Joinder re: #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 part 4, #7 Exhibit 4 part 1, #8 Exhibit 4 part 2, #9 Exhibit 4 part 3, #10 Exhibit 4 part 4)(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 17 STIPULATION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Higbee Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Extending Time for Higbee to File a Responsive Pleading)(Petri, Shawn)
August 21, 2014 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Michael Petri on behalf of Higbee Incorporated. (Petri, Shawn)
August 21, 2014 Filing 15 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by IMO Industries Incorporated. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to add corporate parent on 8/22/2014 (LSP).
August 21, 2014 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by IMO Industries Incorporated.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 13 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Velan Valve Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to add corporate parent on 8/22/2014 (LSP).
August 21, 2014 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Velan Valve Corporation.(Beiermeister, Kathleen)
August 21, 2014 Filing 11 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrier Corporation. (Beiermeister, Kathleen) *Modified to add corporate parent on 8/22/2014 (LSP).
August 21, 2014 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ford Motor Company identifying Other Affiliate State Street Corporation for Ford Motor Company. (Athen, Sara)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
August 20, 2014 Filing 8 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Dan R Larsen on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (BAS)
August 20, 2014 Filing 7 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Christopher J Martinez on behalf of Ford Motor Company. (BAS)
August 20, 2014 Filing 6 *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Subaru of America Incorporated. (Fischer, C) *Modified to add corporate parent on 8/21/2014 (LSP).
August 20, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149522 as to Dan R Larsen. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 20, 2014 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX149523 as to Christopher J Martinez. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
August 19, 2014 Filing 5 NOTICE re: of Service of Instructions and Blank Form of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Daniel, David)
August 18, 2014 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Arizona Boiler Company Incorporated, Asco Valve Incorporated, Aurora Pump Company, AutoZone Incorporated, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated, Crane Company, Becky Davis, Bobby Len Davis, Ford Motor Company, Higbee Incorporated, Honeywell International Incorporated, IMO Industries Incorporated, ITT Corporation, Ingersoll Rand Company, Invensys Systems Incorporated, Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, John Crane Incorporated, Keckley Manufacturing Company, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated, O.C. Keckley Company, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, Robertshaw Controls Company, Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company, Subaru of America Incorporated, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Trane US Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation, Viad Corporation, Viking Pump Incorporated, Warren Pumps LLC, Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated. (DLC)
August 15, 2014 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10776297. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Charles R. Pyle. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: 4:14-CV-02288-TUC-CRP. Magistrate Election form attached. (DLC)
August 15, 2014 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(O'Daniel, David) (DLC)
August 15, 2014 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pima County Superior Court, case number C20143880. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-10776297 filed by Air & Liquid Systems Corporation.(O'Daniel, David) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Civil Cover Sheet, #22 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #23 Notice)(DLC)
August 15, 2014 ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED****SERVICE EXECUTED : Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cert of Compulsory Arbitration and demand for jury upon Arizona Boiler Company on 08/01/2014. (Original filed in Pima County Superior Court on 8/6/14)Personal Service re: Summons, Complaint, Cert of Compulsory Arbitration and demand for jury upon Air & Liquid Systems on 7/24/14. Entered for case management purposes. (DLC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
August 15, 2014 ****STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED**** ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Carrier Corporation. (Docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/15/14 for case management purposes).(DLC)
August 15, 2014 ****STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED**** ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Subaru of America Incorporated.(Docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/15/14 for case management purposes).(DLC)
August 15, 2014 ****STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED**** ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CBS Corporation. (Docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/15/14 for case management purposes).(DLC)
August 15, 2014 ****STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED****ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ford Motor Company. (Docketed in U.S. District Court on 8/15/14 for case management purposes).(DLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated
Represented By: Hollingsworth Barret Marshall, Jr
Represented By: Edward M Slaughter
Represented By: Louani A Bascara
Represented By: Jason J Irvin
Represented By: Paul Saxon Guerriere
Represented By: George William Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California
Represented By: Robert S Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Dan R Larsen
Represented By: Christopher J Martinez
Represented By: Craig Aaron Logsdon
Represented By: Sara Marie Athen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: Samuel D Jubelirer
Represented By: Edward Joseph White
Represented By: David L O'Daniel
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: Heather Neubauer
Represented By: Judith Perritano
Represented By: Gerald Fabiano
Represented By: Allen Eraut
Represented By: David C Hunter, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee Incorporated
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: Tophas Anderson, IV
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Pump Company
Represented By: Joseph Andrew Brophy
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Travis Anthony Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Power International Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Represented By: N Patrick Hall
Represented By: Stephen D Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Christopher Reed Stovall
Represented By: Travis Anthony Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage & Valve Company
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: John Michael Sticht
Represented By: Travis Anthony Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asco Valve Incorporated
Represented By: Timothy G ONeill
Represented By: Amy Lynn Stein
Represented By: Craig M Salzer
Represented By: Jamie Lynne Halavais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: James G Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump Incorporated
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Travis Anthony Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.C. Keckley Company
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Eid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruggles Klingemann Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: John C Hughes
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David Lee Stout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keckley Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Eid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Subaru of America Incorporated
Represented By: Amanda Emily Heitz
Represented By: Lori Ann Zirkle
Represented By: C Megan Fischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invensys LLC
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Christopher Reed Stovall
Represented By: Travis Anthony Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone Incorporated
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Represented By: Tophas Anderson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velan Valve Corporation
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Boiler Company Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Mary Price Birk
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: Ronald Lyle Hellbusch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US Incorporated
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: Tophas Anderson, IV
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Incorporated sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Davis Engineering Company formerly known as Aqua-Chem Incorporated doing business as Cleaver-Brooks Division successor in interest Davis Engineering Company
Represented By: Hollingsworth Barret Marshall, Jr
Represented By: Edward M Slaughter
Represented By: Louani A Bascara
Represented By: Jason J Irvin
Represented By: Paul Saxon Guerriere
Represented By: George William Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom Incorporated
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC sued as successor-by-merger to successor in interest CSK Auto Incorporated doing business as Checker Auto Parts Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kathleen Kelly Kahn
Represented By: Stephen M Bressler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Company doing business as Fulton Sylphon Valves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Represented By: James G Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dial Corporation
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard Companies
Represented By: John Charles Hendricks
Represented By: Kathleen L Beiermeister
Represented By: Tophas Anderson, IV
Represented By: Carol Marie Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated sued individually and as successor in interest CSK Auto Incorporated doing business as Checker Auto Parts Incorporated
Represented By: Thomas J Shorall, Jr.
Represented By: Jason James Boblick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied-Signal Incorporated
Represented By: J Steven Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage & Valve Company doing business as Clark Reliance Corporation
Represented By: Larry Jay Crown
Represented By: John Michael Sticht
Represented By: Travis Anthony Pacheco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higbee Gaskets and Sealing Products Incorporated
Represented By: Shawn Michael Petri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aqua-Chem Incorporated
Represented By: Hollingsworth Barret Marshall, Jr
Represented By: Edward M Slaughter
Represented By: Louani A Bascara
Represented By: Jason J Irvin
Represented By: Paul Saxon Guerriere
Represented By: George William Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Davis
Represented By: Dev Kumar Sethi
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bartlett
Represented By: Peter Akmajian
Represented By: Nectaria Belantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Len Davis
Represented By: Dev Kumar Sethi
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Bartlett
Represented By: Peter Akmajian
Represented By: Nectaria Belantis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?