Haines v. Get Air Tucson Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Blake Haines
Defendant: Get Air Tucson Incorporated, Get Air Tucson Trampolines LLC, Get Air Management Incorporated, Get Air LLC, Trampoline Parks LLC, Patti Goodell, Jacob Goodell, Kierstin Goodell, Scott Goodell, Alan Mcewan, Jr, Val Iverson, Unknown Parties, Alicia Durfee and Scott Hansen
Case Number: 4:2015cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Eric J Markovich
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER Defendant Get Air, LLCs Motion to Bifurcate (Doc. 329 ) is partially granted, as set forth in the attached Order. Trial in the above-captioned matter will be bifurcated into liability and damage phases, as described in the Order (see attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 9/25/2019. (MFR)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 330 ORDER denying 319 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 8/26/2019. (BAR)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER denying 284 Motion to Preclude Testimony of Anthony Gamboa. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 7/31/2019. (BAR)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDERED: GALLCs Motion to Preclude Testimony of Anthony Gamboa 284 remains under advisement. Mr. Hainess Motion in Limine [Doc. 282] is partially granted. GALLCs Motion to Preclude Testimony of Richard Hinrichs 283 is partially granted and part ially denied. GALLCs Motion in Limine No. 2 re: Piercing the Corporate Veil 286 is granted. GALLCs Motion in Limine No 4 re: All Subsequent Remedial Measures 288 is granted. GALLCs Motion in Limine No. 5 re: Termination of Elyana Garcia 289 is partially granted and partially denied. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 7/3/2019. (BAR)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS ORDERED that Defendant's 269 Objection is overruled, and Judge Markovich's 266 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted as set forth. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant's 238 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED as to Plaintiff's punitive damages claim only and is otherwise DENIED. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 10/19/18.(BAC)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 266 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the District Court enter an order GRANTING 238 Get Air, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment as to Plaintiff's punitive damages claim only, and DENYING the remainder of the moti on. Any party may serve and file written objections within 14 days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. A party may respond to another party's objections within 14 days after being served with a copy thereof. No reply to any response shall be filed. If objections are not timely filed, then the parties rights to de novo review by the District Court may be deemed waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 8/2/18.(BAC)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: It is Ordered that Get Air, LLC's Objection (Doc. 164 ) is overruled, and Judge Markovich's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 158 ) is accepted and adopted in full. It is further Ordered that Get Air, LLC's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 97 ) is denied. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/31/2017. (MFR)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDERED that the 159 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in full. Further ordered that Pacific Urethane, LLC's 103 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Defendant Pacific Urethanes, LLC is dismissed from this action with prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/20/2017.(BAR)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that the District Court enter an order DENYING Get Air, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. 97 ). Any party may serve and file written objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy thereof. No reply to any response shall be filed. If objections are not timely filed, then the parties' rights to de novo review by the District Court may be deemed waived. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 2/13/2017. (MFR)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER, The Court defers ruling on Defendant Get Air LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. 97 ) so that further jurisdictional discovery may be performed. The parties shall have up to and including October 10, 2016, to conduct t his jurisdictional discovery. On October 10, 2016, the parties shall each file simultaneous supplemental memoranda, not to exceed 10 pages in length (excluding attachments), addressing personal jurisdiction over Get Air, LLC in light of the jurisdictional discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/16/16. (See attached PDF for complete information.) (KAH)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER, granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Conduct Limited Jurisdictional Discovery Re: Defendant Pacific Urethanes, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. (Doc. 107 ). Plaintiff may depose Mr. Nance, a representative of Quality Foam & Fiber Produc ts, Inc., and Val Iverson. Plaintiff shall have 120 days, up to and including October 10, 2016, to conduct this jurisdictional discovery and file his response to Defendant Pacific Urethanes, LLC's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Eric J Markovich on 6/10/16. (KAH)
February 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: IT IS ORDERED that Magistrate Judge Markovich's 71 Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. Wi thin 7 days of the date this Order is filed, Plaintiff shall file his Third Amended Complaint. Defendant, Get Air, LLC's 43 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. This case remains referred to Magistrate Judge Eric J. Markovich for pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 2/5/16.(BAC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haines v. Get Air Tucson Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake Haines
Represented By: David John Dwyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Air Tucson Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Air Tucson Trampolines LLC
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Air Management Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Air LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trampoline Parks LLC
Represented By: Frank Kyle Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Goodell
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Goodell
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kierstin Goodell
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Goodell
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Mcewan, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val Iverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Durfee
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Hansen
Represented By: Felice Franco Guerrieri
Represented By: Carl F Mariano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?