Armstrong v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Shad Daniel Armstrong
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and James O'Neal
Case Number: 4:2015cv00358
Filed: August 5, 2015
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Nature of Suit: Death Penalty
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2018 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Order to Show Cause and 85 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion for Evidentiary Development. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to file Petitioner's propos ed motions lodged at Documents 84 and 86 in the Court's electronic docket, and to enter Document 86 as a "Notice of Request for Evidentiary Development" in the Court's electronic docket. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 6/4/2018. (SIB)
September 8, 2017 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 58 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Supplement the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 9/7/2017. (See Order for details) (DPS)
March 28, 2017 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 28 Petitioner's motion to stay and abey his mixed petition pending exhaustion in state court. Petitioner shall file a reply to Respondents' Answer to his Petitioner for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than May 31, 2017. Any notice of a request for evidentiary hearing shall be filed no later than July 31, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 3/27/2017. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shad Daniel Armstrong
Represented By: David Anthony
Represented By: Rene Valladares(Designation Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Represented By: Laura Patrice Chiasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James O'Neal
Represented By: Laura Patrice Chiasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?