Beltran v. Ryan et al

Petitioner: Rosalio Delgado Beltran
Respondent: Charles L Ryan and Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Case Number: 4:2017cv00004
Filed: January 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Leslie A Bowman (PS)
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 48 Report and Recommendation. Beltran's Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody (Doc. 1 ) is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment and shall then close its file in this matter. A Certificate of Appealability shall not issue in this case. Signed by Senior Judge Cindy K Jorgenson on 1/8/2019. (KEP)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: Pursuant to the Rules of Practice of this Court, this matter was referred to the Magistrate Judge for report and recommendation. The petition should be dismissed. It is time-barred. (See attached PDF for complete information). Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 1/31/18.(BAC)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner's 15 Motion that the court authorize discovery and expand the case record, is DENIED; Petitioner's 16 Motion for an evidentiary hearing and for appointment of counsel is DENIED. Petitioner's 17 Motion for "access to case authorities available only in electronic databases as LEXIS and WESTLAW" is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 9/13/17.(BAC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beltran v. Ryan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rosalio Delgado Beltran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles L Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Arizona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?