Gividen v. Fochesatto et al

Plaintiff: JoAn Ada Gividen
Defendant: Luciano Fochesatto, Peoples Choice Hospital Group and Seth Guterman
Case Number: 4:2017cv00118
Filed: March 15, 2017
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Cochise
Referring Judge: Bruce G Macdonald
Presiding Judge: Jennifer G Zipps
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Magistrate Judge Macdonald's Report and Recommendation (Doc. 16 ) is accepted and adopted. Defendants' Request for Summary Ruling on Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15 ) is GRANTED. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 12 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk of the Court shall close the file in this matter. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 9/27/2017. (KEP)
September 7, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge enter an order DISMISSING this matter WITHOUT PREJUDICE; DENYING AS MOOT Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint (Doc. 12 ); and DENYING AS MOOT Defendants' Request for Summary Ruling on Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15 ). Any party may serve and file written objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 9/7/2017. (See attached for details) (DPS)
July 24, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Defendants have filed a 12 Motion to Dismiss. The Court NOTIFIES Plaintiff YOU HAVE THIRTY-THREE DAYS FROM JULY 21, 2017 TO RESPOND TO THE MOTION TO DISMISS. If Plaintiff fails to timely comply with every provision of this Order, including these warnings, the Court may dismiss this action without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 7/21/2017. (See attached Order for details) (KEP)
June 7, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 8 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1 ) is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint within twenty days of the date thisOrder is filed. Signed by Judge Jennifer G Zipps on 6/7/2017. (see Order for additional details) (SIB)
May 15, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The Magistrate Judge recommends that the District Judge enter an order GRANTING Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Doc. 2 ); and DISMISSING Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. 1 ) WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Any party may serve and file written objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation. A party may respond to another party's objections within fourteen days after being served with a copy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce G Macdonald on 5/15/2017. (See attached pdf for complete details) (DPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gividen v. Fochesatto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoAn Ada Gividen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luciano Fochesatto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peoples Choice Hospital Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Guterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?