Tamez v. Arizona, State of et al
Plaintiff: Mario Tamez
Defendant: Cochise County Sheriff's Department, Arizona, State of, Cochise County Attorney's Office, Ann Roberts and Cochise County Jail
Case Number: 4:2018cv00345
Filed: July 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Cochise
Presiding Judge: Rosemary Marquez
Referring Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2018 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEAL to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals re: #24 Clerks Judgment, #23 Order by Mario Tamez. (KAH)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Recusal. Both CV-18-00345-TUC-RM and CV-18-00364-TUC-RM shall remain closed. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 9/5/2018. (SIB)
September 4, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION: Requesting the judge to excuse herself (sic) by Mario Tamez. (SIB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that pursuant to the Court's order filed August 29, 2018, Plaintiff to take nothing, and the complaint and action are dismissed without prejudice. (KEP)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER the First Amended Complaint (Doc. #22 ) and this action are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Plaintiff's Motion to Transfer Court Evidence (Doc. #17 ) is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 8/28/2018. (KEP)
August 23, 2018 Filing 22 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona, State of, Cochise County Attorney's Office, Cochise County Sheriff's Department, Ann Roberts, Cochise County Jail filed by Mario Tamez. (6 pages)(KEP)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED Plaintiff's #2 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs is GRANTED. The #1 Complaint is dismissed with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file his first amended complaint within 30 days of the date this Order is filed. Failure to comply will result in, without further notice, a enter judgment of dismissal of this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rosemary Marquez on 8/2/18.(BAC)
July 30, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, Rosemary Marquez. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-00345-TUC-RM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
July 30, 2018 Filing 18 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
July 26, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Transfer Court Evidence by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 16 REQUEST BY NON-PRISONER PRO SE PARTY FOR ELECTRONIC NOTICING filed by Mario Tamez. Pro se parties must promptly notify the Clerks Office, in writing, if there is a change in designated e-mail address or mailing address. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 15 REQUEST for Discovery by Plaintiff Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 14 REQUEST for Discovery by Plaintiff Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 13 REQUEST for Discovery by Plaintiff Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST for Discovery by Plaintiff Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 11 Witness List by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 10 Witness List by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 Witness List by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 Witness List by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7 Witness List by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 Witness List by Mario Tamez. (KEP)
July 17, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR)
July 17, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (MFR)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-0345-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (MFR)
July 17, 2018 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Mario Tamez. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(MFR)
July 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Mario Tamez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(MFR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tamez v. Arizona, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cochise County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Tamez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?