Murphy v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stacy Murphy
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Equifax Information Services LLC, Trans Union LLC, Ditech Financial LLC and Green Tree Servicing LLC
Case Number: 4:2018cv00365
Filed: July 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Tucson Division Office
County: Pima
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M Rateau
Referring Judge: James A Soto
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated.(Dessaules, Jonathan)
September 14, 2018 Filing 32 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SIB)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau for all pretrial proceedings and report and recommendation in accordance with the provisions. All future filings in this case shall be designated: CV-18-00365-TUC-JAS-JR. Signed by Judge James A Soto on 9/12/2018. (KEP)
September 11, 2018 Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. IT IS ORDERED Case is reassigned by random draw to District Judge, James A Soto. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-18-00365-TUC-JAS. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.(BAC)
September 11, 2018 Filing 28 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 26 Magistrate Election Form Deadline sent to all defendants on this date. (BAC)
September 7, 2018 Filing 25 Magistrate Election Form Deadline sent to all defendants on this date. Re-filed at doc. 26, to include form. (BAC) Modified on 9/7/2018 (BAC).
September 7, 2018 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trans Union LLC identifying Corporate Parent Trans Union LLC for Trans Union LLC. (Stuart, John)
September 7, 2018 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Trans Union LLC.(Stuart, John)
September 5, 2018 Filing 22 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacy Murphy: Affidavit of Service re: Summons upon Nancy Taylor on 8/17/2018. (Kent, Trinette)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER pursuant to #20 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Defendant Ditech Financial LLC f/k/a Green Tree Servicing, LLC shall have up to and including October 15, 2018 to file its response to the Complaint (Doc. #1 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 8/31/2018. (KEP)
August 30, 2018 Filing 20 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Extension)(Offenhartz, Joshua)
August 30, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Carl Offenhartz on behalf of Ditech Financial LLC. (Offenhartz, Joshua)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC may file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by September 28, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 8/29/2018. (KEP)
August 29, 2018 Filing 17 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jurayeva, Adiba)
August 21, 2018 Filing 16 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacy Murphy: Affidavit of Service re: Summons upon Vanessa Hernandez on 8/08/2018. (Kent, Trinette)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint : Experian Information Solutions Incorporated answer due 9/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M Rateau on 8/17/2018. (KEP)
August 17, 2018 Filing 14 Magistrate Election Form Deadline sent to defendant on this date. (BAC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 13 Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC)
August 16, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT re: #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
August 16, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Adam Dessaules on behalf of Experian Information Solutions Incorporated. (Dessaules, Jonathan)
August 15, 2018 Filing 8 Magistrate Election Form Deadline re-sent on this date. (BAC)
August 14, 2018 Filing 7 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacy Murphy: Affidavit of Service re: Affidavit of Service upon CT Corporation System on 8/9/2018. (Kent, Trinette)
August 14, 2018 Filing 6 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stacy Murphy: Affidavit of Service re: Summons upon CT Corporation System on 8/7/2018. (Kent, Trinette)
July 31, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KEP)
July 30, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ditech Financial LLC, Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions Incorporated, Trans Union LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
July 27, 2018 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15777374. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jacqueline M. Rateau. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-365-TUC-JR. Magistrate Election form attached. (KEP)
July 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Stacy Murphy. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(KEP)
July 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15777374 filed by Stacy Murphy. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KEP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Murphy
Represented By: Trinette G Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Incorporated
Represented By: Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Adiba Jurayeva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: John Neil Stuart
Represented By: Daniel P Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Joshua Carl Offenhartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Joshua Carl Offenhartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?